Blackfeet Nation v. Stapleton et al
Plaintiff: Blackfeet Nation
Defendant: Dale J. Seifert, Thomas A. Kuka, County of Pondera, Corey Stapleton, Kody Farkell and Jim Morren
Case Number: 4:2020cv00095
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Blackfeet Nation. In light of Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, IT IS ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as MOOT, and all pending deadlines, including the hearing set for October 22, 2020, are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/15/2020. (MMS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blackfeet Nation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Blackfeet Nation-Pondera County Agreement)) (Furlong, Wesley)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court shall hear argument on the issues presented in this case on Thursday, October 22, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. at the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2), that the Court intends to consolidate the hearing with the trial on the merits. Thus, the parties are advised to come to the hearing prepared to fully present their respective cases. See Air Line Pilots Assn, Intl v. Alaska Airlines, Inc., 898 F.2d 1393, 1397 (9th Cir. 1990). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at or before the end of business on October 19, 2020, Defendants shall file their respective briefs, along with all documents, affidavits, declarations, and any other evidence it would like the Court to consider in opposition to Plaintiffs claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at or before the end of business on October 20, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a responsive brief, inclusive of Defendant Stapletons motion to dismiss (Doc. 4), along with all documents, affidavits, declarations, and any other evidence it would like the Court to consider in support of its claims for relief. Finally, IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff SHALL SERVE its Complaint and the attachments thereto (Doc. 1, et seq.) and this Order on Defendants County of Pondera, Kody Farkell, Dale Seifert, Thomas A. Kuka, and Jim Morren before the end of business on Thursday, October 15, 2020. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/14/2020. (SLR)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Correction: re #5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Correction: re #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 Brief in Support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The filing error relates to: Caption. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Austin M. James appearing for Defendant Corey Stapleton (James, Austin) Modified on 10/14/2020 to clean up text and link to motion. (SLR).
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Austin M. James appearing for Defendant Corey Stapleton (James, Austin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. James on behalf of Corey Stapleton (James, Austin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued Summonses emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Pondera County, #2 Issued Summons - Farkell, #3 Issued Summons - Seifert, #4 Issued Summons - Kuka, #5 Issued Summons - Morren) (SLR)
October 9, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2556605. (SLR)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Blackfeet Nation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Gray Declaration, #17 Stapleton - Blank Summons, #18 County of Pondera - Blank Summons, #19 Farkell - Blank Summons, #20 Seifert - Blank Summons, #21 Kuka - Blank Summons, #22 Morren - Blank Summons, #23 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackfeet Nation v. Stapleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale J. Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Kuka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Pondera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Stapleton
Represented By: Austin M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kody Farkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Morren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackfeet Nation
Represented By: Alexander H. Rate
Represented By: Wesley J. Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?