Gillespie v. SDS Imports, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Gillespie
Defendant: Does A to K and SDS Imports, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00036
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Richard A. Ramler, Jorden S. Ramler, Calvin J. Stacey. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/4/2021. (ACC)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/23/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/23/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/23/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/17/2021. (TLO)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SDS Imports, LLC. (Stacey, Calvin)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SDS Imports, LLC. (Stacey, Calvin)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Summons served on Defendant SDS Imports, LLC on April 29, 2021, filed by Raymond Gillespie. (Ramler, Richard)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SDS Imports, LLC. Counsel Ramler provided the original Summons through U.S. Mail and requested it be returned in self-addressed envelope. Summons mailed to Counsel Ramler this date. Counsel may also download and print the Summons for service if desired. (SLR)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does A to K, SDS Imports, LLC, filed by Raymond Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)
April 6, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2645356 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. SDS Imports, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A to K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDS Imports, LLC
Represented By: Calvin J. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Gillespie
Represented By: Jorden S. Ramler
Represented By: Richard A. Ramler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?