Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Spellmon et al
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity and Waterkeeper Alliance
Defendant: Scott A. Spellmon and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Intervenor Defendant: State of Montana
Case Number: 4:2021cv00047
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The State of Montana has filed an #12 unopposed motion for leave to intervene.IT IS ORDERED that the State of Montana's request for leave to intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/7/2021. (ACC)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Montana. (MMS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene Jeremiah R. Langston appearing for Interested Party State of Montana (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Answer) (MMS)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club for Douglas Hayes (Hayes, Douglas)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas P. Hayes for Center for Biological Diversity. Counsel Hayes is a registered electronic user. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/27/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/12/2021. (SLR)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth (Glitzenstein, Eric)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity (Margolis, Jared)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Douglas Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2663718.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Hayes Affidavit) (Bechtold, Timothy)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Eric R. Glitzenstein. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/26/2021. Counsel Glitzenstein is a registered electronic user. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/11/2021. (SLR)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jared M. Margolis. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/26/2021. Counsel Margolis is a registered electronic user. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/11/2021. (SLR)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Eric Glitzenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2662600.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Waterkeeper Alliance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 EG Affidavit) (Bechtold, Timothy)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Jared Margolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2662598.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Waterkeeper Alliance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Margolis Affidavit) (Bechtold, Timothy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Civil Process Clerk, #2 Issued Summons - Lieutenant General Scott Spellman, #3 Issued Summons - U.S. Army Corps of Engineers)Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service (ACC)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Friends of the Earth, Waterkeeper Alliance, Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)
May 3, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2658237 (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Spellmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Jared Michael Margolis
Represented By: Eric R. Glitzenstein
Represented By: Douglas P. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Jared Michael Margolis
Represented By: Eric R. Glitzenstein
Represented By: Douglas P. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Jared Michael Margolis
Represented By: Eric R. Glitzenstein
Represented By: Douglas P. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Spellmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Jeremiah R. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?