Talcott et al v. Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Talcott, Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Inc., The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013 and The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013
Defendant: Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00101
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Complaint, (Second Amended Answer and Demand for Jury Trial) by Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC. (Luck, Bradley)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a telephonic preliminary pretrial conference on this matter on November 10, 2021, at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse in Great Falls. Maxon Davis represented Plaintiffs. Bradley Luck and Emma Mediak represented Defendant IT IS ORDERED the following schedule, established with the concurrence of the parties, will be observed: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 11/24/2021. Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Motions due by 2/14/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/10/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC)
November 10, 2021 Set Deadlines: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2023. (ACC)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Inc., Bradley B. Talcott, The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013. (Davis, Maxon)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Inc., Bradley B. Talcott, The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013. (Davis, Maxon)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Linda K. Caricaburu, James Talcott Construction, Inc., Bradley B. Talcott, The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013. (Davis, Maxon)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC. (Luck, Bradley)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC. (Luck, Bradley)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, James Talcott Construction, Inc., Bradley B. Talcott, The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013, Linda K. Caricaburu. (SLR)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons) (SLR)
October 1, 2021 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/5/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/5/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/5/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/30/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC. (Luck, Bradley)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, case number DDV-21-0432, filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons) (TLO)
September 27, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AMTDC-2737988 (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talcott et al v. Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Talcott
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda K. Caricaburu
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Talcott Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bradley Talcott Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Linda K. Caricaburu Living Trust Dated June 18, 2013
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennon Agency, LLC
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Represented By: Emma L. Mediak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?