Neal et al v. Greenfields Irrigation District et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Neal, Danielle Neal, James P. Troy and David M. Sabato
Defendant: Greenfields Irrigation District, Fort Shaw Irrigation District and Does A-E
Case Number: 4:2021cv00106
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Neal, Danielle Neal, James P. Troy, David M. Sabato. Fort Shaw Irrigation District waiver sent on 10/20/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Marr, Keith)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Neal, Danielle Neal, James P. Troy, David M. Sabato. Greenfields Irrigation District waiver sent on 10/20/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Marr, Keith)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lloyd Neal, Danielle Neal, James P. Troy, David M. Sabato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Order) (Marr, Keith)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Susan B. Swimley on 10/20/2021 by Danielle Neal, Lloyd Neal, David M. Sabato, James P. Troy. Waiver of Service due by 11/19/2021. (Marr, Keith)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Stephanie Oblander on 10/20/2021 by Danielle Neal, Lloyd Neal, David M. Sabato, James P. Troy. Waiver of Service due by 11/19/2021. (Marr, Keith)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fort Shaw Irrigation District, Greenfields Irrigation District. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Fort Shaw Irrigation District)Counsel is directed to download and print the summons for service. (ACC)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Lloyd Neal, Danielle Neal, James P. Troy, David M. Sabato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)
October 18, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2752189 (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal et al v. Greenfields Irrigation District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Neal
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Gregory Gerard Pinski
Represented By: James Robert Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Represented By: Paul L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Neal
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Gregory Gerard Pinski
Represented By: James Robert Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Represented By: Paul L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Troy
Represented By: Paul L. Neal
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Gregory Gerard Pinski
Represented By: James Robert Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Sabato
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Gregory Gerard Pinski
Represented By: James Robert Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Represented By: Paul L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenfields Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Shaw Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A-E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?