American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc. v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.
Defendant: Natures Song, LLC, William Hall Stewart, Whistling Swam Farms, LLC, The United States of America, The Internal Revenue Service, Northern Seed, The State of Montana, The Montana Department of Revenue, The Department of Labor and Industry Unemployment Division and The Department of Labor and Industry Employment Relations Division
Case Number: 4:2023cv00008
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Filing 16 Proof of Service filed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. Service by Certified Mail on 3/30/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
April 7, 2023 Filing 15 Proof of Service filed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. Service by Certified Mail on 3/27/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
April 6, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. The Department of Labor and Industry Employment Relations Division waiver sent on 3/7/2023, answer due 5/8/2023; The Department of Labor and Industry Unemployment Division waiver sent on 3/7/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding #12 Stipulated Motion for Consent to Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/28/2023. (MMS)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 Stipulated Motion Consent to Entry of Judgment Teresa Grace Whitney appearing for Defendant The Montana Department of Revenue (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Whitney, Teresa)
March 24, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to The Internal Revenue Service. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
March 24, 2023 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Summons as to The Internal Revenue Service, The United States of America, re #7 Amended Complaint, (Johnson, Steven)
March 15, 2023 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Natures Song, LLC, William Hall Stewart(as Personal Representative of Estate of Carol Ann Wright Stewart (deceased), William Hall Stewart(individually). (ACC)
March 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Steven M. Johnson appearing for Plaintiff American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Johnson, #2 Clerk's Entry of Default) (Johnson, Steven)
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Johnson, Steven)
February 22, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Steven)
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. Natures Song, LLC served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc. William Hall Stewart, personal representative of Estate of Carol Ann Wright Stewart (deceased) served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (Johnson, Steven) Modified on 3/15/2023 to add party served(ACC).
February 17, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. William Hall Stewart(individually) served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons_Stewart_Personal Representative, #2 Summons_Nature Song) (MMS)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE AND MONEY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note_2, #3 Exhibit Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit Security Agreement_2, #5 Exhibit Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Mortgage_2, #7 Proposed Summons_Stewart_Individually, #8 Proposed Summons_Stewart_PersonalRep, #9 Proposed Summons_NatureSong, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS)
February 9, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-3017590 (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc. v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natures Song, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hall Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whistling Swam Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Seed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Teresa Grace Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Labor and Industry Unemployment Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Labor and Industry Employment Relations Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Farm Mortgage Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?