Lynn v. The Federal Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: John A Lynn
Defendant: The Federal Savings Bank, PHH Mortgage Corporation doing business as PHH Mortgage Services, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 4:2023cv00041
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is ASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian Morris. (SLL)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/29/2023. (KAH)
August 25, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Doc 1 and Doc 5-2 re #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #1 Complaint. Gregory Gerard Pinski appearing for Plaintiff John A Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Doc 1, #2 Redacted Doc 5-2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pinski, Gregory)
August 18, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Jones, Natasha)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation shall have up to and including September 15, 2023, to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint in the above captioned action. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2023. (TLO)
August 16, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint . Natasha Prinzing Jones appearing for Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jones, Natasha)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc., having requested a thirty (30) day extension of time in which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant has up to and including September 18, 2023, in which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2023. (TLO)
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint. M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy)
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christy S. McCann on behalf of Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Vacate 6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/16/2023. (SAJ)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO HOLD TRUSTEE'S SALE IN ABEYANCE. (MMS)
August 16, 2023 Terminate Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction per ORDER granting #11 Motion to Vacate 6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, for Preliminary Injunction. (SAJ)
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Vacate 6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, for Preliminary Injunction. Gregory Gerard Pinski appearing for Plaintiff John A Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Pinski, Gregory)
August 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha Prinzing Jones on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation (Jones, Natasha)
July 31, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A Lynn. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Pinski, Gregory)
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A Lynn. Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. (Pinski, Gregory)
July 27, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A Lynn. The Federal Savings Bank served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Pinski, Gregory)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Plaintiff shall make every reasonable effort to notify Defendants of this hearing. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/25/2023. (SLL)
July 18, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction of John A. Lynn filed by John A Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Pinski, Gregory) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/29/2023) (KAH). Modified on 8/29/2023 to reflect attachment 2 was replaced per Order #22 . (MMS).
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction filed by John A Lynn. (Pinski, Gregory)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction. Gregory Gerard Pinski appearing for Plaintiff John A Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pinski, Gregory)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (SAJ)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John A Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Summons) (SAJ)
July 17, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3099690 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. The Federal Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Lynn
Represented By: Dennis P. Conner
Represented By: Gregory Pinski
Represented By: Gregory Gerard Pinski
Represented By: James Robert Conner
Represented By: Keith D. Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation doing business as PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Represented By: Elliott McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?