Love et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Leonard D. Love and Karen L. Morey
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Robinson Insulation Company, Grogan Robinson Lumber Company, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., RTX Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Meritor, Inc., Morse Tec LLC, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc, Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Daimler Truck North America, LLC, DCo LLC, Deere & Company, Eaton Corporation, Genuine Parts Company d/b/a National Automotive Parts Association (a/k/a NAPA) and Rayloc, a division of NAPA, a Georgia corporation, Mack Trucks, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Truck Company, a Delaware corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Hobart Brothers LLC, Lincoln Electric Company, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Murco Wall Products, Inc., The Sherwin Williams Company, KCG, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company and Does A-Z
Case Number: 4:2023cv00059
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff Leonard D. Love #166 Motion to Vacate December 4, 2023, Motions Hearing and good cause appearing therefore, Plaintiff's Motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions Hearing set for December 4, 2023 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2023. (ACC)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES: Upon review of Plaintiff's #165 Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Leonard D. Love without Prejudice, and good cause appearing therefore, Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's, Leonard D. Love's, claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All parties are to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2023. (ACC)
November 21, 2023 Filing 166 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Vacate 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion . Ethan A. Welder appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Welder, Ethan) Modified on 11/21/2023 to add Unopposed (ACC).
November 21, 2023 Filing 165 MOTION to Dismiss Leonard D. Love Claims. Ethan A. Welder appearing for Plaintiff Leonard D. Love. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Welder, Ethan)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian T. Clark. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/5/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/20/2023. (KAH)
November 20, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE by Murco Wall Products, Inc. re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, Notice to Appear by Zoom (Stepp, Katherine)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Combined Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on November 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/20/2023. (ACC)
November 17, 2023 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Ethan A. Welder appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Welder, Ethan)
November 17, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE by Deere & Company re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, (Tuntland, Kirsten)
November 17, 2023 Filing 159 MOTION Brian T. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3162532.). Martin S. King appearing for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian T. Clark, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Martin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 158 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leonard D. Love (Welder, Ethan)
November 16, 2023 Filing 157 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #156 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hobart Brothers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David Knoll, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Bob Bilokonsky) (Evenson, Kirk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Kirk D. Evenson appearing for Defendant Hobart Brothers LLC. (Evenson, Kirk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 155 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #154 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of John Schuster, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Aimee Trusso) (Evenson, Kirk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Kirk D. Evenson appearing for Defendant Lincoln Electric Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE by Genuine Parts Company re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, Notice to Appear by Zoom (Ridgeway, Susan)
November 16, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE by BNSF Railway Company to Appear by ZOOM re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. (Nicastro, Anthony) Modified on 11/16/2023 to add text (ACC).
November 16, 2023 Filing 151 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, to appear by Zoom (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: Plaintiff's #34 Motion and Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not to be Compelled to Submit to Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/16/2023. (ACC)
November 16, 2023 Filing 149 NOTICE by Navistar, Inc. re 148 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, to Appear by Zoom (Oie, Joshua)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #26 MOTION to Dismiss , #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 12/4/2023 at 01:30 PM at the Paul Hatfield Federal Courthouse in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Parties that wish to appear remotely will file a notice with the Court, and the Clerk of Court's Office will provide the Zoom link. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/15/2023. (SLL)
November 10, 2023 Filing 147 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
November 9, 2023 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leonard D. Love (Welder, Ethan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bendix Autolite Corporation, Other Affiliate Allied Chemical & Dye Corp., Other Affiliate Bendix Corporation, Other Affiliate AlliedSignal, Inc. for Honeywell International, Inc... (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2023 Filing 144 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leonard D. Love (Welder, Ethan)
November 6, 2023 Filing 143 Notice of Correction: re #142 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ACC)
November 6, 2023 Filing 142 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #141 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Kirsten Tuntland appearing for Defendant Deere & Company. (Tuntland, Kirsten) Modified on 11/6/2023 to terminate motion and update docket text to reflect document is a Brief (ACC).
November 6, 2023 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Kirsten Tuntland appearing for Defendant Deere & Company. (Tuntland, Kirsten)
November 2, 2023 Filing 140 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by RTX Corporation re #50 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Wilson, Lance)
November 1, 2023 Filing 139 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The Sherwin Williams Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Ranta, Katie)
November 1, 2023 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Katie Rose Ranta appearing for Defendant The Sherwin Williams Company. (Ranta, Katie)
November 1, 2023 Filing 137 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2023 Filing 136 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodrich Corporation identifying Corporate Parent RTX Corporation for Goodrich Corporation.. (Davis, Maxon)
November 1, 2023 Filing 135 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodrich Corporation. (Davis, Maxon)
November 1, 2023 Filing 134 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leonard D. Love (Welder, Ethan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 133 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: MOTION HEARING held 10/31/2023: Counsel John Lacey (in person), Jinnifer Mariman and Sam Taylor (by ZOOM), present on behalf of Plaintiff; Counsel Anthony Nicastro appearing on behalf of BNSF Railway Co, Counsel Elizabeth Brotten appearing on behalf of Cummins Inc and Honeywell International Inc, Counsel Kirk Evenson and Tyler Waite appearing on behalf of General Electric Co, Hobart Brother LLC and Lincoln Electric Co, Counsel Deborah Parker and Martin King appearing on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corp, Counsel Cynthia Brooks appearing on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co and Welco Manufacturing Co, Counsel Nathan Huey appearing on behalf of Meritor Inc, Paccar Inc and RTX Corp, Counsel Peter Ivins, Susan Miltko and David Strup appearing on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip LLC and Eaton Corp, Counsel Marshall Hill appearing on behalf of DCo LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC and Union Carbide Corp, Counsel Heather Neubauer appearing on behalf of Mack Truck, Inc and KCG Inc, Counsel Joshua Oie appearing on behalf of Navistar Inc, Counsel Nicholas Pagnotta appearing on behalf of Murco Wall Products Inc, Counsel Susan Ridgeway appearing on behalf of Genuine Parts Co; all appearing by ZOOM. Counsel Maxon Davis appearing on behalf of Goodrich Corp, Parker Hannifin Corp and Kaiser Gypsum Co Inc; present in person. This hearing is with regard to #34 Plaintiffs Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief filed by Leonard Love and Karen Morey. Counsel Lacey, Counsel Nicastro (BNSF) and Counsel Deborah Parker (Lockheed Martin Corp) with argument. This matter is submitted an Order will be issued. Hearing commenced at 1:40 p.m. and concluded at 2:53 p.m. (Court Reporter Y. Heinze) (Law Clerk: A. Sterup), (Hearing held in Charles Pray Crtrm (Great Falls)) (ACC)
October 31, 2023 Terminate Deadlines as to #34 Response ddl 10/27/23 (ACC)
October 30, 2023 Filing 132 NOTICE by Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey re #34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Claire Michael, MD) (Mariman, Jinnifer)
October 30, 2023 Filing 131 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow, Inc., Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Corp. for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 30, 2023 Filing 130 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Leave to Appear to Appear by Zoom. Zoom link emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/30/2023. (KAH)
October 30, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by DCo LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation re #59 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Hellbusch, Ronald)
October 30, 2023 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Heather Holland Neubauer appearing for Defendants KCG, Inc., Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order in Support of Motion for Remote Appearance) (Neubauer, Heather)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMBINED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Upon review of Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Response to Lockheed Martin Corporation; Murco Wall Products, Inc.; RTX Corporation; Eaton Aeroquip, LLC; Meritor, Inc.; and Paccar, Incs (Defendants) Motions to Dismiss, and good cause appearing therefor, Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Combined Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on November 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/30/2023. (TLO)
October 30, 2023 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #26 MOTION to Dismiss , #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mariman, Jinnifer)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Genuine Parts may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 p.m. on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/30/2023. Zoom link emailed to counsel Susan G. Ridgeway (MMS)
October 30, 2023 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Remote by Zoom . Susan G. Ridgeway appearing for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ridgeway, Susan)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Honeywell and Cummins, Inc. may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 p.m. on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/30/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Sorenson Brotten (ACC)
October 30, 2023 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Zoom . Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten appearing for Defendants Cummins, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Sorenson Brotten, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2023 Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection via Joinder in BNSF's Response filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Deborah M. Parker Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Parker, Deborah)
October 27, 2023 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicastro, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Sporn, #3 Exhibit Armijo Order) (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #115 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that BNSF may appear by ZOOM at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 PM on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/27/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Nicastro and Knight (ACC)
October 27, 2023 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Zoom . Anthony Michael Nicastro appearing for Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Propsed Order to Appear by Zoom) (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Murco Wall Products, Inc. may appear by Zoom at the hearing set for 1:30 p.m. on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/27/2023. (ACC) Modified on 10/27/2023 ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl for Murco Wall Products. (ACC).
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #111 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 pm on October 31, 2023. Zoom link sent to counsel. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/27/2023. (KAH)
October 27, 2023 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Nicholas John Pagnotta appearing for Defendant Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pagnotta, Nicholas)
October 27, 2023 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely At the October 31, 2023 Hearing. Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mariman, Jinnifer)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants DCo, Abex, and UCC may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 PM on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/27/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Hill (ACC)
October 27, 2023 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance at Hearing Via Zoom . Marshall Blake Hill appearing for Defendants DCo LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Appearance By Zoom) (Hill, Marshall)
October 27, 2023 Filing 108 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Parker, Deborah)
October 27, 2023 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 27, 2023 Filing 106 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Leave to Appear. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that RTX may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 PM on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Davis and Huey. (ACC)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #101 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ArvinMeritor may appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 PM on October 31, 2023. Zoom link emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2023. (KAH) Modified on 10/26/2023 to update docket text (KAH).
October 26, 2023 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at Hearing . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant RTX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Huey, Nathan)
October 26, 2023 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at Hearing . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Huey, Nathan)
October 26, 2023 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely at Hearing . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant Meritor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Huey, Nathan)
October 26, 2023 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Stepp, Katherine)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Leave to Appear by Zoom at thehearing in this matter set for 1:30 pm on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Counsel Oie (ACC)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear by ZOOM at the hearing set for 10/31/23 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Counsel King, Kato and Yee (ACC)
October 26, 2023 Filing 97 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Paccar, Inc. re #49 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Hawkins, Eric)
October 26, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Joshua Oie appearing for Defendant Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Oie, Joshua)
October 26, 2023 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Martin S. King appearing for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Martin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Dillon Kato on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Kato, Dillon)
October 26, 2023 Filing 93 Notice of Correction: re #91 Administrative Record *Acknowledgment of Pro Hac*. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ACC)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Deborah Parker. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/10/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2023. (ACC)
October 26, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Anthony Taddeo for General Electric Company. (Taddeo, Anthony) Modified on 10/26/2023 to correct document title(ACC).
October 26, 2023 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobart Brothers LLC. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 26, 2023 Filing 89 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hobart Brothers LLC. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 26, 2023 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc. for Lincoln Electric Company.. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 26, 2023 Filing 87 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lincoln Electric Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear via Zoom at the October 31, 2023 hearing. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/25/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Papez and Brooks (ACC)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Goodyear Tire shall file either an Answer or a motion in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial is on or before November 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/25/2023. (ACC)
October 25, 2023 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Jacqueline R. Papez appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Jacqueline R. Papez appearing for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2023 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline R. Papez and Cynthia Brooks on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (Papez, Jacqueline) Modified on 10/25/2023 to add attorney(ACC).
October 24, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION Deborah M. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3148991.). Martin S. King appearing for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah M. Parker, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Martin)
October 24, 2023 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paccar, Inc.. (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 78 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration) (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant Paccar, Inc.. (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meritor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cummins, Inc. for Meritor, Inc... (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear by ZOOM at the hearing set for 1:30 p.m. on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/24/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl for Eaton Aeroquip. (ACC)
October 24, 2023 Filing 74 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Meritor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A _ Declaration) (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant Meritor, Inc.. (Huey, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Susan Moriarity Miltko appearing for Defendants Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Miltko, Susan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Ivins, Peter)
October 24, 2023 Filing 70 ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation. (Ivins, Peter)
October 24, 2023 Filing 69 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration) (Ivins, Peter)
October 24, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Peter B. Ivins appearing for Defendant Eaton Aeroquip, LLC. (Ivins, Peter)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear by Zoom at the hearing in this matter set for 1:30 PM on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/24/2023. ZOOM link emailed to Cnsl Papez (ACC)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Welco Manufacturing Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Welco shall file either an Answer or other motion in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial on or before November 18, 2023.. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/24/2023. (ACC)
October 24, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Zoom . Jacqueline R. Papez appearing for Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Jacqueline R. Papez appearing for Defendant Welco Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2023 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Papez, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline R. Papez and Cynthia Brooks on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Papez, Jacqueline) Modified on 10/25/2023 to add attorney(ACC).
October 24, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Yee, Laura)
October 23, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Hobart Brothers LLC, Lincoln Electric Company re #43 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Philip A. Kulinski (Evenson, Kirk)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald L. Hellbusch. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/7/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/23/2023. (TLO)
October 23, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION Ronald L. Hellbusch to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3147820.). Marshall Blake Hill appearing for Defendants DCo LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Hill, Marshall)
October 23, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Tsomaya on behalf of Murco Wall Products, Inc. (Tsomaya, Alexander)
October 23, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Blake Hill on behalf of DCo LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation (Hill, Marshall)
October 23, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey re #28 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Linder, Mark)
October 20, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation (Strup, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Murco Wall Products, Inc. re #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Deans, Gregory)
October 20, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Murco Wall Products, Inc. re #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Stepp, Katherine)
October 19, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey re #28 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Taylor, Sam)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lance Wilson. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/2/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/18/2023. (ACC)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Hawkins. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/2/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/18/2023. (ACC)
October 17, 2023 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION Lance Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 400016604.). Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant RTX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Huey, Nathan) Modified on 10/17/2023 to clean up text (ACC).
October 17, 2023 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION Eric T. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 400016604.). Nathan Huey appearing for Defendants Meritor, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Huey, Nathan) Modified on 10/17/2023 to clean up text(ACC).
October 17, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Huey on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (Huey, Nathan)
October 17, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Holland Neubauer on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Neubauer, Heather)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Strup. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/1/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2023. (ACC)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip A. Kulinski. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/1/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2023. (ACC)
October 17, 2023 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company. (Tuntland, Kirsten)
October 17, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Tuntland on behalf of Deere & Company (Tuntland, Kirsten)
October 16, 2023 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION David P. Strup to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3144464.). Susan Moriarity Miltko appearing for Defendants Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Miltko, Susan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Moriarity Miltko on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Eaton Corporation (Miltko, Susan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 38 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RTX Corporation. (Huey, Nathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Nathan Huey appearing for Defendant RTX Corporation. (Huey, Nathan)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection : Motion Hearing is set for 10/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/16/2023. (SLL)
October 13, 2023 Filing 35 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection filed by Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2023.10 LTR from BNSF, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declarations of Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Order from Bree, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Order from Malloy) (Lacey, John)
October 13, 2023 Filing 34 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Request for Declaratory Relief to Uphold Their Right Not To Be Compelled To Submit To Autopsy or Other Destructive Dissection . John F. Lacey appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Lacey, John)
October 12, 2023 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION Philip A. Kulinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3142748.). Kirk D. Evenson appearing for Defendants Hobart Brothers LLC, Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Philip Kulinski) (Evenson, Kirk)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura Patricia Yee. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/27/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/12/2023. (TLO)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gergory L. Deans NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.; granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Stepp NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/27/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/12/2023. (TLO)
October 11, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION Katherine Stepp to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3142042.). Nicholas John Pagnotta appearing for Defendant Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pagnotta, Nicholas)
October 11, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION Gregory Deans to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory L. Deans ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3142036.). Nicholas John Pagnotta appearing for Defendant Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pagnotta, Nicholas)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sam E. Taylor #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Linder NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/26/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/11/2023. (KAH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 27 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 A) (Pagnotta, Nicholas)
October 11, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss . Nicholas John Pagnotta appearing for Defendant Murco Wall Products, Inc.. (Pagnotta, Nicholas)
October 11, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BNSF Railway Company.. (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 11, 2023 Filing 24 BNSF's ANSWER to #22 Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company. (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 Remark: Original State Court Documents received from Cascade County and placed on shelf in the clerks office. (SAJ)
October 11, 2023 Filing 22 COMPLAINT AND DEMANT FOR JURY TRIAL filed in the Asbestos Claims Court of the State of Montana, Montana Twenty-Third Judicial District Court against All Defendants, filed by Leonard D. Love and Karen L. Morey. (SAJ)
October 11, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED ( from Asbestos Claims Court of the State of Montana, Montana Twenty-Third Judicial District Court, case number DV-57-2023-0000013-AE.) (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Exhibit A, #3 State Court Plaintiffs' Notices, #4 State Court Summons) (SAJ)
October 11, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION Mark A. Linder to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3141629.). Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Linder, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mariman, Jinnifer)
October 11, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION Sam E Taylor II to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3141609.). Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman appearing for Plaintiffs Leonard D. Love, Karen L. Morey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sam Taylor, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mariman, Jinnifer)
October 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxon R. Davis on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Davis, Maxon)
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxon R. Davis on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Davis, Maxon)
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navistar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation, Corporate Parent TRATON US, LLC for Navistar, Inc... (Oie, Joshua)
October 10, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Navistar, Inc.. (Oie, Joshua)
October 10, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
October 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Holland Neubauer on behalf of Mack Trucks, Inc. (Neubauer, Heather)
October 10, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by KCG, Inc.. (Neubauer, Heather)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony B. Taddeo, Jr.. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/25/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/10/2023. (TLO)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Holland Neubauer on behalf of KCG, Inc. (Neubauer, Heather)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (King, Martin)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana L. Bennett) (King, Martin)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Martin S. King appearing for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (King, Martin)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION Laura Patricia Yee to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3140292.). Martin S. King appearing for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Patricia Yee, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (King, Martin)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION Anthony B. Taddeo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3140152.). Kirk D. Evenson appearing for Defendant General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anthony Taddeo) (Evenson, Kirk)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxon R. Davis on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Davis, Maxon)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RTX Corporation. (Huey, Nathan)
October 3, 2023 TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is assigned to the Honorable Brian Morris. Signed Brian Morris on October 3, 2023. (SLL)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Joinder by Lockheed Martin Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal, (King, Martin)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RTX Corporation from THE ABSESTOS CLAIMS COURT OF THE STATE OF MONTANA, MONTANA TWENTY-THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, case number DV-57-2023-0000013-AE, filed by RTX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sumner, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ringo) (SAJ)
September 29, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 400016575 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard D. Love
Represented By: Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman
Represented By: John F. Lacey
Represented By: Ethan A. Welder
Represented By: Mark Asa Linder
Represented By: Sam E Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Morey
Represented By: John F. Lacey
Represented By: Ethan A. Welder
Represented By: Jinnifer Jeresek Mariman
Represented By: Mark Asa Linder
Represented By: Sam E Taylor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Anthony Michael Nicastro
Represented By: Chad Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grogan Robinson Lumber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Represented By: Anthony B Taddeo, Jr
Represented By: Tyler A Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Holland Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Martin S. King
Represented By: Laura Patricia Yee
Represented By: Dillon Kato
Represented By: Deborah Maria Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Represented By: Jacqueline R. Papez
Represented By: Cynthia D. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTX Corporation
Represented By: Harrison Dell Davis
Represented By: Nathan Huey
Represented By: Lance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC
Represented By: Susan Moriarity Miltko
Represented By: Peter B. Ivins
Represented By: David Paul Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Huey
Represented By: Harrison Dell Davis
Represented By: Eric T Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sorenson Brotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Truck North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCo LLC
Represented By: Marshall Blake Hill
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Kirsten Tuntland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Peter B. Ivins
Represented By: Susan Moriarity Miltko
Represented By: David Paul Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company d/b/a National Automotive Parts Association (a/k/a NAPA) and Rayloc, a division of NAPA, a Georgia corporation
Represented By: Susan G. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Holland Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Oie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Truck Company, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Harrison Dell Davis
Represented By: Nathan Huey
Represented By: Eric T Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Marshall Blake Hill
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers LLC
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Represented By: Tyler A Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Represented By: Tyler A Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Marshall Blake Hill
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murco Wall Products, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas John Pagnotta
Represented By: Alexander T. Tsomaya
Represented By: Gregory L. Deans
Represented By: Katherine Hartsfield Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin Williams Company
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCG, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Holland Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Cynthia D. Brooks
Represented By: Jacqueline R. Papez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?