Nelson v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stacy Nelson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2023cv00060
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Social Security Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opening brief is due within 60 days of filing of the answer. Defendant's response brief due within 30 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, due within 14 days after defendant's brief is filed.Opening Brief due by 1/30/2024. (ACC)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 Administrative Record filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Becia, Franco)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to Standing Order DLC-51 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (MMS)
November 13, 2023 Magistrate Judge John Johnston added. (MMS)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/13/2023. (TLO)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Becia, Franco)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/5/2023. (SAJ)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Stacy Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (SAJ) Modified on 10/5/2023 to remove "LODGED"(SAJ).
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stacy Nelson. (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Nelson
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?