Goldsmith v. Hill County et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Goldsmith
Defendant: Hill County, Jamie Ross, Randall Lycan and John Does #1-10
Cross Plaintiff: Ryan Stewart
Cross Defendant: Jesse Shane Valdez
Case Number: 4:2024cv00012
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule, established with the concurrence of the parties, will be observed: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2025 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2024. Discovery shall close on: 12/13/2024. All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions, shall be filed with supporting briefs on or before: 2/11/2025. Proposed final pretrial order: 4/14/2025. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/29/2024. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC)
February 29, 2024 ***Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on February 28, 2024. (SLL)
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Hill County, Randall Lycan, Jamie Ross, Ryan Stewart. (McCarty, Molenda)
February 26, 2024 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Sharon Goldsmith. (Gallardo, Paul)
February 26, 2024 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Sharon Goldsmith. (Gallardo, Paul)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Sharon Goldsmith. (Gallardo, Paul)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 Proof of Service filed by Hill County, Randall Lycan, Jamie Ross, Ryan Stewart. Service by Summons on 02/02/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sheriff's Return of Personal Service) (McCarty, Molenda)
February 2, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Jesse Shane Valdez answer due 2/23/2024. (SAJ)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jesse Shane Valdez. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (SAJ)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Jesse Shane Valdez, re #7 Amended Complaint, #3 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint (McCarty, Molenda)
January 22, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (State Court) against Hill County, John Does #1-10, Randall Lycan, Jamie Ross, Ryan Stewart, filed by Sharon Goldsmith. (ACC)
January 22, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER (State Court) to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hill County. (ACC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2024: #1 Errata to Hill County's Answer) (ACC).
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (State Court) against Hill County, filed by Sharon Goldsmith. (ACC)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from MT Twelfth Judicial District Court, Hill County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 State Court Issued Summonses, #3 Defendant's Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #4 Defendant's Notice of Substitution of Counsel, #5 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #6 Proposed Amended Complaint, #7 Order Granting Motion Amend, #8 Notice of Filing of Removal, #9 Notice of Removal) (ACC)
January 22, 2024 Remark: State Court documents received by Clerk's Office in electronic format. No original hard copies were received. (ACC)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jesse Shane Valdez by Jamie Ross, Randall Lycan, Hill County, Ryan Stewart. (McCarty, Molenda)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/26/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/26/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/26/2024. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/19/2024. (MMS)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Hill County, Jamie Ross, Randall Lycan, and Ryan Stewart from MONTANA TWELFTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, HILL COUNTY, case number DV 21-2022-100-WF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Notice of Appearance, #4 State Court Notice of Filing of Removal and Request for Transfer) (SAJ)
January 19, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3195351 (SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Hill County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Goldsmith
Represented By: Patrick F. Flaherty
Represented By: Paul Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill County
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Ross
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Lycan
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross plaintiff: Ryan Stewart
Represented By: Molenda Lee McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Jesse Shane Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?