Belanus v. Dutton et al
Plaintiff: Duane Ronald Belanus
Defendant: Leo Dutton, Adam Shanks, Eric Gilbertson, Jason Grimmis, Officer Hawthorne, Officers on Duty 11July 2009, Brian Olson, Nicholas England, Travis DeMichaels, City of Helena, Lewis and Clark County Jail, Lewis and Clark County and State of Montana
Case Number: 6:2012cv00065
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER denying 232 Motion Under Rul 48(b); denying 233 Motion for Judgment NOV; denying 234 Motion for New Trial, ; denying 235 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 236 Motion Under Rule 60(b). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/7/2018. Mailed to Belanus (TAG)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 204 Motion Miscellaneous; denying 205 Motion for Order/Judgment Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/20/2017. copies provided to parties at FPTC (DED)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER finding as moot 156 Motion in Limine; granting 158 amended Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion in Limine; granting 161 Motion for On-Call Procedure; denying 170 Motion to Supplement/Amend; denying 174 Motion for Judicial Notice; granting 176 Motion in Limine; denying 177 Motion in Limine; denying 192 Motion for Subpoena Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/16/2017. Mailed to Belanus (TAG)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. Motion for Service of Process 169 denied in part; granted in part. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/6/2017. Mailed to Belanus; subpoenas forwarded to USMS with form 285 (TAG)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 133 Motion to be in Appropriate Clothing for Court; denying 134 Motion for Experts; denying 135 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 136 Motion to File Under Seal ; denying 137 Motion to Hold a Hearing via Telephone denying [139 ]; denying 138 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Hearing; denying 139 Motion for Limited Legal Assistance; denying 141 Motion for Sanctions; denying 142 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 143 Motion to Clarify; denying 147 Motion for Experts; denying 148 Motion for Funds . Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/10/2017. Mailed to Belanus with model instructions as directed (TAG) Modified on 10/10/2017 to correct docket text(TAG).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 70 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 81 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 83 , 100 Motions to Compel; denying 85 , 87 , 89 Motions for for Adverse Jury Instructions; denying 101 Motion for Contempt; denying 114 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Defendants Grimmis, Shanks, and Gilbertson are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/23/2017. Mailed to Belanus. (TAG)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 in full. Amended Complaint 5 DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/8/2013. Mailed to Belanus. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belanus v. Dutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Ronald Belanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Grimmis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officers on Duty 11July 2009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis DeMichaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Helena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis and Clark County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis and Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?