Guille v. Sweeney et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Guille
Defendant: Josh Sweeney, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, Tom Wood, Chris Connel, Myron E. Beeson, Robert Turner, K. Cozby, Nurse Jane Doe #1, Med. Personnel Jane Doe #2, Med. Administrator Jane Doe #3, Josh Knight, Cage Officer John Doe and Billie Reich
Case Number: 6:2014cv00051
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying without prejudice 159 Motion in Limine; denying 169 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 170 Motion for Recusal, denying as moot 171 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum; denying 176 Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/7/2018. Copy mailed to Guille. (ASG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER sustaining 127 Objection; granting 128 Motion for Protective Order; granting 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 142 Motion for Sanctions; denying 143 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 146 Motion to Stay; granting 151 Motion for Leave to File; denying 153 Motion to Compel; denying 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 161 Motion to Strike ; denying 162 Motion to Strike. Defendants Kirkegard, Wood, Conell, Besson DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/18/2018. Mailed to Guille (TAG)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Compel; denying 90 Motion for Protective Order. On or before August 31, 2017, Defendants shall advise the Court whether they would be willing to participate in a mediation of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/17/2017. Mailed to Guille. (TAG)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying without prejudice 92 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 106 Motion for TRO; granting 111 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/10/2017. Mailed to Guille. (TAG)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING 79 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Turner, Knight, and the John Doe Cage Control officer and all official capacity claims against all defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/14/2016. Mailed to Guille. (TAG)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Extension of Time; denying without prejudice 36 Motion to Compel; denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 44 Motion for Protective Order to the limited extent that Defendants may file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/16/2015. Mailed to Guille. (TAG, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 in full. Plaintiff's claims regarding denial of due process, the grievance procedures, and denial of medical care are DISMISSED. Defendants K. Cozby, Billie Reich, and Jane Does are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/11/2015. Mailed to Guille. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guille v. Sweeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Guille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Connel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron E. Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Cozby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med. Personnel Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med. Administrator Jane Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cage Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?