Lout v. Jovanovich et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery John Lout
Defendant: Sam Jovanovich, Roxanne Tuss, Leroy Kirkegard and Roxanne Wigert
Case Number: 6:2015cv00055
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Motion to Dismiss Count X 110 and Joint Motion to Dismiss Count X 113 areGRANTED. Partial Motion for Summary Judgment on Count X 105 is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/22/2017. Mailed to Lout. (TAG)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying without prejudice 82 Motion for Order to Schedule Depositions; granting 84 Motion for Protective Order; denying 86 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/6/2017. Mailed to Lout. (TAG)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 78 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/10/2017. Mailed to Lout (TAG)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Waive L.R. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/5/2016. Mailed to Lout. (TAG, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 54 Request to Obtain One Set of Free Documents Electronically Filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/26/2016. Copy mailed to Lout. (ASG, )
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 40 in full. Defendants Samuel Jovanovich, Denise Deyott, Roxanne Wigert, Daniel Riddle, Leonard Mihelich, Myron Beeson, Billie Reich, Kristy Cobban, Tristan Kohut, Scott Pirinian, G. Mark Henderson, D avid Pentland, and Daniel Chladex and Count I (excessive force), Count III (failure to report), Counts IV & V ("settlement offer"), Count VI (mail), Count VII (nutrition and vitamins), and Count IX Gob dismissal) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJU DICE. All federal claims raised in Count VIII are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. "Petition for a Permanent Order of Protection" 31 is DENIED. Motion to Dismiss Defendant Reese 38 is GRANTED. Motion to Strike 47 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2016. Mailed to Lout. (TAG, )
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Emergency Injunction. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/2/2015. Mailed to Lout. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lout v. Jovanovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery John Lout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Jovanovich
Represented By: Kirsten K. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Tuss
Represented By: Kirsten K. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Represented By: Kirsten K. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Wigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?