Conner v. Kirkegard et al

Plaintiff: Andrew David Conner
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard, Robert Shaw, Toni Barclay, Associate Warden Woods, Dawn Phillpot, SSG Sweeney, C/O Kent, C/O Short, C/O Cales and C/O Fossness
Case Number: 6:2015cv00081
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING 77 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/12/2018. Mailed to Conner (TAG)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 56 Motion for Protective Order; granting 58 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/12/2017. Mailed to Conner (TAG)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/25/2017. Mailed to Conner. (TAG)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 44 Motion Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/10/2017. Mailed to Conner. (TAG)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/19/2016. Mailed to Conner. (TAG)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/5/2016. Mailed to Conner. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Kirkegard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Phillpot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSG Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Cales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Fossness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?