Banschbach v. Dr. Kohut
Plaintiff: Jacob Banschbach
Defendant: Dr. Kohut
Case Number: 6:2015cv00107
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING 87 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/9/2019. Mailed to Banschbach (TAG)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal Document Nos. 56-3, 56-4, and 56-5. The attachments to Defendant's Reply Brief (Docs. 64 -1 and 64 -2) areSTRICKEN. Defendants have until March 2, 2018 to refile a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 2/5/2018. Mailed to Banschbach with copy of Local Rules as directed (TAG)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Motion to Compel; 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/10/2017. Mailed to Banschbach (TAG)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 30 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/5/2016. Mailed to Banschbach. (TAG, )
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 19 Motion for TRO. Banschbach's claim that Dr. Kohut sexually assaulted him is DISMISSED. Banschbach's denial of medical care claim is allowed to proceed. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/27/2016. Mailed to Banschbach (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banschbach v. Dr. Kohut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Banschbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kohut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?