Strizich v. Batista et al
Plaintiff: Jory Strizich
Defendant: Mike Batista, Leroy Kirkegard, Leonard Mihelich, Tom Woods, Myron Beeson, Tom Wilson, Dan Hess, Lorna Kuchinsky, Billie Reich and Kristy Cobban
Case Number: 6:2016cv00012
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Alter Judgment. The Court will not consider any additional filings that do not relate directly to Strizich's ability to appeal from the final judgment in this matter. Copy mailed to Strizich.Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/20/2018. (HEG)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 Motion for Leave to File; denying 48 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 58 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/23/2018. Mailed to Strizich (TAG)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 in full. Claims dismissed as described. Defendants Leroy Kirkegard, Mike Batista, Leonard Mihelich, Thomas Wood, Myron Beeson, Tom Wilson, Dan Hess, Loma Kuchinsky, Billie Reich, Kristy Cobban, Roxanne Wigert, Sam Jovanovich, Paul Lucier, Robert Shaw, Sam Casey, Irl Lambertson, Chris Connell, Vera Hoscheid, Captain McNiel, and all John Does are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/15/2017. Mailed to Strizich (TAG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strizich v. Batista et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jory Strizich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Kuchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Cobban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?