National Association for Gun Rights v. Motl et al
Plaintiff: |
National Association for Gun Rights |
Defendant: |
Jonathan Motl, Timothy C. Fox and Leo Gallagher |
Case Number: |
6:2016cv00023 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Helena Office |
County: |
LEWIS & CLARK |
Presiding Judge: |
Dana L. Christensen |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 23, 2019 |
Filing
56
ORDERED: The Court's order of September 6, 2017 (Doc. 44) is VACATED to the extent it upholds the constitutionality of the so called "registered voter requirement" of Mont. Code. Ann. § 13-37-203. As to this statutory provision, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment should have been GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG)
|
January 19, 2018 |
Filing
53
ORDER The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's request to withdraw their pending fee motions re 52 . Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/19/2018. (HEG)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing
46
ORDERED that Montana Code Annotated 13-35-225(3) is declared unconstitutional as being violative of the First Amendment and Defendants are hereby permanently enjoined from commencing and prosecuting any actions under MCA 13-35-225(3) re (44 in 6:16-cv-00023-DLC). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (DED)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDERED: Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc 34) is GRANTED; Consolidated Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc 27) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the order; Defendants shall show cause , within 30 days of this Order, why declaratory relief should not be awarded on NAGR's third claim for relief and why a permanent injunction should not be issued. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/6/2017. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG)
|
February 23, 2017 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Affidavit to S.N. for entering attorney information. Copy of order mailed to PHV counsel. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/23/2017. (HEG)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting in part and denying in part (3) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 6:16-cv-00023-DLC; granting in part and denying in part (3) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ in accordance with the Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/23/2016. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?