St. Peter's Hospital et al v. American International Group et al
Plaintiff: St. Peter's Hospital, Mountain States Healthcare Reciprocal Risk Retention Group and Columbia Casualty Company
Defendant: American International Group and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2016cv00091
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDERED: The above-entitled case is dismissed with prejudice asthe merits of the case were resolved by settlement and stipulation, each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/22/2018. (HEG)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDERED: The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and proposed order ofdismissal within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/23/2018. (HEG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/18/2018. (HEG)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDERED: The clerk of court is directed to seal the following documents: Filed by Lexington: Dkt. 121-3, 121-7, 121-8, 121-10, 121-25, 121-26, which are exhibits to Lexington's Notice of Filing exhibits (Dkt. 121 ); and Dkt. 122-5 and 122-6, wh ich are attachments to Lexington's Notice of Filing Original Discovery Documents. Filed by Plaintiffs: Dkt. 120-14, 120-18, 120-19, and 120-20, which are exhibts to Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Exhibits (Dkt. 120). FURTHER ORDERED: The parties shall file redacted versions of the sealed documents together with amended notices of filing. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/15/2018. (HEG)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 80 Second MOTION in Limine. Please review order for complete details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/7/2018. (HEG)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDERED: Plaintiffs' First Motions in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part re 72 . Please review order for complete details . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/4/2018. (HEG)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDERED: l. Lexington's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 2. St. Peter's is DISMISSED as a party plaintiff. 3. Lexington's counterclaim against St. Peter's is DISMISSED. 4. The caption is amended to reflect the dismissal of St. Peter's as a Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/1/2018. (HEG)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 77 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/31/2018. (HEG)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 99 Motion Allow Live Trial Testimony of Michael Bazzi. Michael Bazzi will be permitted to testify at trial via contemporaneous transmission with appropriate safeguards through livestream videoconferencing from Behmke Reporting and Video Services at 2225 E. Bayshore Road, Suite 200, Palo Alto, California, or an alternative location to be designated by the Court. Please review order for complete details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/16/2018. (HEG)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDERED: re 79 During the duty to defend phase of litigation, the parties are precluded from introducing any comment, argument, testimony, or evidence concerning damages in the Underlying Suit, Fisher v. St. Peter's Hospital, et al, ADV 2014-722, First Judicial District, Lewis & Clark County, Montana, or this suit. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/22/2018. (HEG)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/1/2018. (HEG)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to take Judicial Notice. Judicial notice is taken of the record of pleadings and docket sheet from Fischer v. St. Peter's Hospital, et al, ADV 2014-722, First Judicial District, Lewis and Clark County, Montana. No notice is taken as to the truth or factual or other allegations in Cause ADV 2014-722. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/26/2017. (HEG)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 28 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order re Confidential Information filed by Mountain States Healthcare Reciprocal Risk Retention Group, Columbia Casualty Company, St. Peter's Hospital. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/6/2017. (HEG)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 26 Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Mountain States Healthcare Reciprocal Risk Retention Group, St. Peter's Hospital, 24 Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Lexington Insurance Company, 20 Order Setting. 1. P laintiffs and Defendant shall each file a supplemental preliminary pretrial statement addressing the matters in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before April 14, 2017. 2. Counsel are invited to consider revision of the proposed protective orde r to comport with L.R. 5.1 and 26.4 and to include the material stated above within quotation marks on page 2 and 3 of this order. The parties may resubmit a revised proposed protective order on or before April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/31/2017. (HEG)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/23/2017. Affidavits provided to K. h. for entering attorney's information. Copy mailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/8/2017. (HEG)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER discharging 3 Order to Show Cause; counsel appearance on behalf of Lexington to be filed on the record by 2/3/17; Plaintiff to take steps to complete service on AIG and to report to the Court by 2/10/17 and/or advise Court that AIG is to be dismissed. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/31/2017. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Peter's Hospital et al v. American International Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Peter's Hospital
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain States Healthcare Reciprocal Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?