Woods v. United States
Plaintiff: Debbie Woods
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 6:2016cv00101
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: JEFFERSON
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED: All claims of the plaintiff, Debbie Woods, against the defendant, United States of America, are dismissed with prejudice as fully compromised and settled on the merits, each party to bear their own costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/27/2018. (HEG)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED: All deadlines are VACATED. Dismissal Papers and proposed order due by 3/7/2018. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/5/2018. (HEG)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: re 5 Preliminary Pretrial Statement filed by Debbie Woods, 8 Scheduling Order. 1. Plaintiff's preliminary pretrial statement, amended in compliance with L.R. 16.2(b)91)to cure the stated deficiencies, shall be filed on or befor e March 10, 2017. 2. Separate written disclosures of all non-retained experts (expert witnesses not required to provide written reports) shall be served upon opposing counsel and filed by Plaintiff on or before July 14, 2017, and by Defendant on or before August 18, 2017. All other matters and deadlines in the Court's Order of February 7, 2017, remain if full force and effect. PLEASE REVIEW ENTIRE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/6/2017. (HEG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Woods
Represented By: John C. Doubek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?