McColl v. American Naturopathic Council et al
Plaintiff: Tina McColl
Defendant: American Naturopathic Council and Allied Professionals Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2017cv00040
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDERED: All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/22/2019. (HEG)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 McColl's Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/24/2018. (JDR)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/23/2018. (JDR)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. Allied shall pay reasonable costs and fees in the amount of $9,810.00 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/22/2018. (JEC)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. The Court directs Allied to submit a copy of the Corporate Services Agreement to the Court for an in camera inspection by October 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/15/2018. (JDR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDERED: Adopting Findings and Recommendations re 128 . AIC'S Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (1) Misrepresentation; (2) Licensed Adjustor is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Join Party is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Move to Reinstate Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/21/2018. (HEG)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. The Court directs Allied to review the June 4, 2015 entry to ensure that only communications between itself and its defense counsel in the underlying case have been redacted, and to supplement its disclosure as necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/6/2018. (JDR)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED: Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate's Order Dated April 6, 2018, is OVERRULED re 112 . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/15/2018. (HEG)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Compel. Please review entire order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/6/2018. (HEG)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDERED: The settlement conference currently set for April 4, 2018, is hereby VACATED. This case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Johnston for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Arrangements for the conference will be made by Judge Johnston. Copy of order emailed to JTJ Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/14/2018. (HEG)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDERED: This order supplements the Court's Orders of December 18, 2017, and January 11, 2018. Further proceedings in this case are referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan to conduct all hearing necessary and to submit findings of fact an d recommendations for disposition by a Judge of the COurt of any motion except from the magistrate judge;s jurisdiction as specified in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Copy of this order emailed to TJC Chambers. Counsel receive electronic notification. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/22/2018. (HEG)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER referring to Magistrate TJC for address of issues presented by Palintiff's Notice of Issue regarding costs and fees associated with the taking of Sara Schroder, Esq.'s deposition and by Plaintiff's Motion to Join party and for Leave to Move to Reinstate Judgment, and to conduct all necessary hearings and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations. Chambers notified of order via email. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/11/2018. (HEG)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 61 Show Cause Hearing: 1. participation of M. Kadish, as phv counsel, is stricken from the record; 2. on or before 12/22/2017, counsel shall meet and confer and file a joint report with the Court addressing discovery issues; 3. if an a greement is not reached, each party shall file a brief on or before 12/22, stating its position on each unresolved issue, each party may then file a response brief by 12/29; and 4. if an agreement on all issues is not reached, Defendants shall submit and produce to Court in camera any all all documents with the scope of discovery dispute by 12/29/2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/15/2017. (DED)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/5/2017. (HEG) Modified on 12/5/2017 Finance notified via Ad Hoc (HEG).
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael B. Kadish for Allied Professionals Insurance Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/28/2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/13/2017. SH advised of admission. Copy of Order mailed to Mr. Kadish. (DED)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 2 Motion to Remand; granting 10 Motion to Set Aside Default; finding as moot 12 Motion to Quash.Defendant shall file acknowledgment of service on or before 6/16/17 and on or before 6/23/2017 Defendant shall filed an answer to or a motion wth supporting brief directed to Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/14/2017. (DED)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 15 Stipulation filed by Allied Professionals Insurance Company Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/8/2017. 1. Plaintiff is granted a 14-day extension to include 5/23/17 to file a response to Dft's pending motion to quash summons or for dismissal; 2. Execution on the Judgment entered in State Court, is stayed pending disposition of Dft's pending motion to set aside default. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McColl v. American Naturopathic Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina McColl
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Naturopathic Council
Represented By: Brett Charles Jensen
Represented By: Robert L. Sterup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Professionals Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett Charles Jensen
Represented By: Robert L. Sterup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?