LaFountaine v. Holiday Al Management Sub

Plaintiff: Carol LaFountaine
Defendant: Holiday Al Management Sub
Case Number: 6:2017cv00095
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDERED: 1. The parties shall submit and file with the Court a joint written report as to the status of arbitration proceedings not later than 30 days for the date of this order. 2. The written report shall include a specific outline of the anticipa ted timetable necessary to carry out and complete submission of the case for resolution. 3. All other deadlines and requirements in the Court's January 30, 2018, Order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/10/2018. (HEG)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 18 ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. The matter is referred to Judicial Arbitration and Mediation Services, Inc., for arbitration in accordance with the terms and conditions of the Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Employme nt Related-disputes effective January 6, 2014. All proceedings in the Court are stayed pending final resolution of the arbitration proceedings. Please review entire order for complete details and information. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/30/2018. (HEG)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing is GRANTED. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, set for January 22, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for January 30, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/17/2018. (HEG)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 3 ORDERED: This case will be remanded to state court on October 4, 2017, unless Defendant files an amended notice of removal properly alleging jurisdiction on or before that date re 1 . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/27/2017. (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFountaine v. Holiday Al Management Sub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol LaFountaine
Represented By: Tara A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Al Management Sub
Represented By: Leah T. Handelman
Represented By: Tessa A. Keller
Represented By: Kathryn Mahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?