U. v. Healthcare Service Corporation

Plaintiff: Jessica U.
Defendant: Healthcare Service Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv00005
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Charles C. Lovell
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 48 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 4/22/2019. (HEG)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery and Motion Deadlines (Doc. 40) is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended until April 8, 2019, and the fully briefed motions deadline is extended until May 24, 2019. All other deadlines established by the Court's May 30, 2018, Preliminary Scheduling Order (Doc. 32) shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 3/4/2019. (HEG)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meredith A. Shippee for Healthcare Service Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 4/2/2018. (HEG)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa S. Kantor for Jessica U. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 2/1/2018. (DED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U. v. Healthcare Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica U.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cok
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Green
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?