Montana Green Party et al v. Stapleton
Plaintiff: Tamara R. Thompson, Doug Campbell, Antonio Morsette, Cheryl Wolfe, Montana Green Party, Harry C. Hoving, Adrien Owen Wagner, Danielle Breck and Steve Kelly
Defendant: Corey Stapleton
Case Number: 6:2018cv00087
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Cochenour on behalf of Corey Stapleton (Cochenour, Matthew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steve Kelly, Danielle Breck, Harry C. Hoving, Doug Campbell, Adrien Owen Wagner, Tamara R. Thompson, Montana Green Party, Antonio Morsette, Cheryl Wolfe. Corey Stapleton waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rhoades, Quentin)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Correction: re #7 MOTION James C. Linger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment and Acceptance of Terms of Admission ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2178349.). The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (HEG)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order. James C. Linger appearing for Plaintiffs Danielle Breck, Doug Campbell, Harry C. Hoving, Steve Kelly, Montana Green Party, Antonio Morsette, Tamara R. Thompson, Adrien Owen Wagner, Cheryl Wolfe. Modified on 8/27/2018 to update docket event text due to incorrect event selected during e-filing (HEG).
August 22, 2018 Remark: PHV counsel James Linger is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications. (HEG)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirements of CM/ECF Registration. Copy of Order #5 and letter mailed to counsel. (HEG)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/5/2018. Copy of Affidavit provided to S. N. to add attorney information. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/21/2018. (HEG)
August 21, 2018 Remark: Electronic notification for PHV Linger termed pending CM/ECF Registration. (HEG)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Submission of Proposed Order re: #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James C. Linger by Danielle Breck, Doug Campbell, Harry C. Hoving, Steve Kelly, Montana Green Party, Antonio Morsette, Tamara R. Thompson, Adrien Owen Wagner, Cheryl Wolfe. (Rhoades, Quentin) Modified on 8/14/2018 to update event text due to incorrect event used during e-filing and link to motion (HEG).
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Correction: re #2 MOTION James C. Linger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2178349.) The filing error relates to: No Proposed Order submitted. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (JEC) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct receipt number information (HEG).
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION James C. Linger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2178349.) Quentin M. Rhoades appearing for Plaintiffs Danielle Breck, Doug Campbell, Harry C. Hoving, Steve Kelly, Montana Green Party, Antonio Morsette, Tamara R. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James C. Linger) (Rhoades, Quentin) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct receipt number information (HEG).
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corey Stapleton filed by Steve Kelly, Danielle Breck, Harry C. Hoving, Doug Campbell, Adrien Owen Wagner, Tamara R. Thompson, Montana Green Party, Antonio Morsette, Cheryl Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)
August 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2178241. (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montana Green Party et al v. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara R. Thompson
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Campbell
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Morsette
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wolfe
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Green Party
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry C. Hoving
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrien Owen Wagner
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Breck
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kelly
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Represented By: James C. Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Stapleton
Represented By: Matthew T. Cochenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?