Conlan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Plaintiff: Nicholas Conlan
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv00094
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/6/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to plaintiff. (JEC)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING (Attachments: #1 consent to electronic service, #2 request to file by email). Mailed to plaintiff. (HEG)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nicholas Conlan (Attachments: #1 Financial Report, #2 Letter) (HEG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Copy mailed to plaintiff with updated docket sheet. (HEG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (HEG)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas Conlan. (HEG)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John G. Crist. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/19/2018. Sent via US Mail to Plaintiff. (JEC)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Nicholas Conlan. (HEG)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge on 7/25/18. (HEG)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Nicholas Conlan. (HEG)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing state court documents. All retained on open civil shelf. (HEG)
September 25, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2198759 (HEG)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Answer to Complaint Notice to Clerk of Court (Crist, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint -Conlan's Amended Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Crist, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Crist, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from MT 5th Judicial District Court, Jefferson County, case number DV-2018-20., filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (HEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conlan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Conlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: John G. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?