Wallace v. Bouley et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Wallace
Defendant: Silver Bow County Attorney Shea, Montana State Prison Infirmary, Robert Spoja and Benjamin Bouley
Case Number: 6:2019cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/4/2019. Mailed to Wallace (TAG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Gregory Lynn Wallace. (TAG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gregory Lynn Wallace. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Letter) (TAG).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Response due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/31/2019. Mailed to Wallace with forms (TAG)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Gregory Lynn Wallace. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Bouley et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Bow County Attorney Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana State Prison Infirmary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Spoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Bouley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?