Burnett et al v. PacificSource Health Plans et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Burnett and Daniel B. Burnett
Defendant: John Doe, PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith and Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00045
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/18/2019. (HEG)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED: The preliminary pretrial conference set for October 1, 2019, is VACATED and RESET for 11:00 a.m. on October 29, 2019, at the Paul G. Hatfield Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Counsel shall confer on or before October 10, 2019, to develop a joint discovery plan. The plan shall be filed on or before October 18, 2019. Each party shall file a preliminary pretrial statement on or before October 18, 2019, which shall fully comply with all requirements offed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(l)(A)(i), (ii) and (iii) and L.R. 16.2(b)(l). (See order.) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/29/2019. (HEG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION Reset Preliminary Pretrial Conference Robert C. Lukes appearing for Defendant PacificSource Health Plans (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lukes, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/20/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/27/2019. (HEG)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand is DENIED. Defendant Teresa Smith is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. Defendants PacificSource Health Plans and Teresa Smith's Motion to Dismiss Claims of Rhonda Burnett is GRANTED. 3. Plaintiff Rhonda Burnett's claimed loss of consortium is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 4. Defendant Teresa Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT. The caption will be amended to reflect the dismissal of Teresa Smith. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/26/2019. (HEG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 ERRATA RE: Declaration of Teresa Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Declaration of Teresa Smith) (Lukes, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2019 to add link to #6 (HEG).
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Cole, Justin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC. (Davis, Maxon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Rhonda Burnett filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Lukes, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Daniel B. Burnett, Rhonda Burnett. (Blewett, Alexander)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Rhonda Burnett filed by Daniel B. Burnett, Rhonda Burnett. (Blewett, Alexander)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel) (Lukes, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Complaint with Jury Demand by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Lukes, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PacificSource Health Plans. (Lukes, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Rhonda Burnett filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Lukes, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Rhonda Burnett Robert C. Lukes appearing for Defendants PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith (Lukes, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel B. Burnett, Rhonda Burnett. (Blewett, Alexander)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Daniel B. Burnett, Rhonda Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Soans Order, #2 Exhibit B - Soans Complaint) (Blewett, Alexander)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Daniel B. Burnett, Rhonda Burnett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rhonda Burnett) (Blewett, Alexander)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rhonda Burnett, Daniel B. Burnett. (HEG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Cascade County District Court Case Register Report. All original state court documents retained on civil shelf in the Helena office. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (HEG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC. (Davis, Maxon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC. (Davis, Maxon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to MOTION Notice of Removal filed by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC. (Davis, Maxon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Cole, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #4 Brief/Memorandum in Support by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Cole, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Cole, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment Justin K. Cole appearing for Defendants PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith (Cole, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith. (Cole, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2332730. (JEC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PacificSource Health Plans, Teresa Smith from MT 8th Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number DDV-19-0339. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett et al v. PacificSource Health Plans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Burnett
Represented By: Anders Blewett, IV
Represented By: Alexander Blewett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B. Burnett
Represented By: Anders Blewett, IV
Represented By: Alexander Blewett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacificSource Health Plans
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Smith
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?