Phillips v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Phillips
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00060
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The parties shall file the case management plan on or before January 21, 2020. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/14/2019. (JEH)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Moore, Mikel)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/29/2019. (HEG)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Mikel L. Moore appearing for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moore, Mikel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America.. (Moore, Mikel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mikel L. Moore on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Moore, Mikel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Severin M. Beliveau, Registered Agent on October 9, 2019, filed by Nicole Phillips. (Storrar, Keif)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Original Summons mailed to counsel for service. (HEG)
September 20, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2369851. (HEG)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicole Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Phillips
Represented By: Keif Alexander Storrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?