Schultz v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Schultz
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00073
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Charles C Lovell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement; Proposed Case Management Plan; Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/6/2020. Lead counsel for the respective parties shall appear in person on 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Charles C. Lovell, to participate in a preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 12/27/2019. (HEG)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Parker, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company answer due 12/23/2019. (HEG)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company on 12/02/19, filed by James Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Process) (Angel, Geoffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Schultz, filed by James Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Refusal to Waive Service) (Angel, Geoffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company on 10/31/2019 by James Schultz. Waiver of Service due by 12/2/2019. (Angel, Geoffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Original Summons mailed to counsel for service. (HEG)
October 31, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2388776. Filing fee was paid initially on 10/24/19 but due to technical issues by counsel the shell case filing was not completed. (HEG)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by James Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) Modified on 10/31/2019 to modify docket description(HEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Schultz
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?