Garrett
Plaintiff: Caleb Garrett
Case Number: 6:2019cv00081
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: Review of the record indicates federal admiralty jurisdiction is lacking. Plaintiff's Complaint For Exoneration From Or Limitation Of Liability is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/10/2020. (HEG)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Brief/Response to Order re Maritime Jurisdiction filed by Caleb Garrett. (Marra, Thomas)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED: Plaintiff shall have to and including January 3, 2020, to file a brief directed to whether federal admiralty jurisdiction has, by applicable law, been adequately well-pleaded to invoke this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/19/2019. (HEG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION David E. Russo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2410303.) Thomas A. Marra appearing for Plaintiff Caleb Garrett (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Russo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Admission of Russo) (Marra, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Monition Thomas A. Marra appearing for Plaintiff Caleb Garrett (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Directing Issuance of Monition, #2 Text of Proposed Order Special Restraining Order) (Marra, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2409758. (HEG)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, filed by Caleb Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Ad Interim Bond, #2 Declaration of Caleb Garrett, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Garrett
Represented By: Thomas A. Marra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?