Montana Environmental Information Center v. United States Department of Energy
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Case Number: 6:2020cv00029
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/19/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/19/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/12/2020. (HEG)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Department of Energy. (Smith, Mark)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on US Attorney for the District of Montana on May 6, 2020, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on United States Attorney General on 4/17/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on United States Department of Energy on 4/21/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Civil Process Clerk on 4/13/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilson, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Energy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Copies emailed to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 William Barr Summons, #2 Kurt Alme Summons) (HEG)
April 9, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2467177 (HEG)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Energy, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montana Environmental Information Center v. United States Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: David K.W. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Chad C. Spraker
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?