Young v. Fox
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Tim Fox
Case Number: 6:2020cv00065
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Charles C Lovell
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP GIVEN NEW CIRCUMSTANCES; AND TO COMPEL THE COURT TO HONOR RULE 5.1(b) by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed informa pauperis (Doc. 1) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either file a completed application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs or pay the full $400 filing fee on or before October 19, 2020. Plaintiff is receiving electronic service and IFP form is attached for filing. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/11/2020. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form) (HEG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Huguette Nicole Young. (HEG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Huguette Nicole Young. (HEG)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Young with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?