Lamm et al v. Bullock et al
Plaintiff: Brent Nave, Joe Lamm, Sylvia Wagner, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner and Ravalli County Republican Central Committee
Defendant: Corey Stapleton and Stephen Bullock
Case Number: 6:2020cv00067
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Remark: CC account holder James Bopp, Jr. issued a refund for a duplicate charge for the Notice of Appeal #76 . (HEG)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvia Wagner, Brent Nave, Jeff Wagner, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee, Joe Lamm, Fiona Nave. Appellants emergency motion for injunctive relief pending appeal (Docket Entry No. 3) is denied. See Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20, (2008).The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. (HEG)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by Sylvia Wagner, Brent Nave, Jeff Wagner, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee, Joe Lamm, Fiona Nave. Appellants optional reply in support of the motion is due October 4, 2020.The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. (HEG)
October 5, 2020 Filing 80 USCA Case Number 20-35847 for #76 Notice of Appeal and TIME SCHEDULE ORDER filed by Sylvia Wagner, Brent Nave, Jeff Wagner, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee, Joe Lamm, Fiona Nave. (HEG)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDERED: Member-Plaintiffs request for an injunction pending appeal (Doc. 77) is DENIED. re (77 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/30/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 78 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #77 MOTION to Stay re #73 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,, filed by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner. (Jones, Emily)
September 30, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Stay re #73 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,, Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Jones, Emily)
September 30, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner, Ravalli County Republican Central Committee. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0977-2551348. (Milbank, Courtney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 75 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions held on 9-22-2020 before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerk's office, or the court reporter. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact court reporter JoAnn Jett Corson, 406-698-9965, joannjettcorson@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (JJC)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDERED: Plaintiffs requests for injunctive, declaratory, or any other form of relief are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment in both the lead case (CV 2066HDLC) and the member case (CV2067HDLC) shall be entered in the Defendants favor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/30/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Stephen Bullock for proceedings held on 9/22/20 before Judge Christensen. Court reporter JoAnn Jett Corson. Type of transcript: 3-Day. Transcript due by 10/1/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying (107) Motion to Strike; granting (109) Motion to Supplement. This matter is now fully submitted, and no further motions or declarations shall be permitted. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/25/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (ASG)
September 25, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Supplement the Record on Standing Tyler R. Green appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Spenser Merwin) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 24, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: (38 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Intervenor Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Hertz) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Milanovich, Anita)
September 23, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. James on behalf of Corey Stapleton (James, Austin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee Regarding Oral Argument Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 22, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Stephen Bullock of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Joint Rules of Montana Legislature) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 65 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dana L. Christensen: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2020 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, et al. Mr. Tyler Green (arguing), Mr. James Brown, and Mr. James Bopp (arguing) appearing on behalf of Plaintiffs. Ms. Anita Milanovich appearing and arguing on behalf of Intervenor-Plaintiffs. Mr. Raphael Graybill (arguing), Ms. Rylee Sommeres-Flanagan and Mr. Christopher Abbott appearing for Defendant Governor Bullock. Mr. Austin James appearing for Defendant Corey Stapleton. Ms. Abha Khanna (arguing) and Mr. Peter Meloy appearing on behalf of Intervenor-Defendants. Ms. Patricia Klanke (arguing) and Hayden Johnson appearing on behalf of Amicus. Argument is heard by the parties. Defendant Bullock to file joint rules regarding legislature. Court deems matter fully submitted. In recess. Hearing commenced at 1:00pm and concluded at 3:48pm. (Court Reporter JoAnn Corson.) (Law Clerk: R. Wavra), (Hearing held in Missoula, MT) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (ASG)
September 22, 2020 Filing 64 Notice of Correction: re (72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss. The filing error relates to: Multiple Motion Types Not Selected. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party re (73 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add text to event description (HEG).
September 21, 2020 Filing 62 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Patrick D. Llewellyn regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 61 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Simone T. Leeper regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 60 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Hayden S. Johnson regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Filing 59 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Johnathan Diaz regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Order and Letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED: The motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 8689) are GRANTED on the condition that they do their own work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Diaz, Mr. Llewellyn, Ms. Leeper, and Mr. Johnson file a separate pleading acknowledging their admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15)days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDERED: Member-Plaintiffs (CV 2066HDLC) motion (Doc. 92) is GRANTED. Because Member-Plaintiffs (CV 2066HDLC) have already filed their overlength brief (Doc. 93) no further action on their part is necessary. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 21, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Diaz and Llewellyn are now registered e-filers and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 20, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re (72 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sam Rubino) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ryan Dollar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Spenser Merwin) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief Tyler R. Green appearing for Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 18, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re (80 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION File Overlength Brief filed by Greg Hertz, Scott Sales. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Polio, Dennis)
September 18, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION Hayden Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545462.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayden Johnson, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION Simone Leeper to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545456.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simone Leeper, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION Patrick Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545449.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Llewellyn, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION Jonathan Diaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2545431.) Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Amicus League of Women Voters of Montana (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Diaz, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Kauffman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED: Defendant Stephen Bullocks Unopposed Motion for Overlength Brief is GRANTED re (80 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 42 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Intervenor-Plaintiffs in the lead case (CV 20-66-H-DLC) shall have until on or before September 20, 2020 to file a response brief to Intervenor-Defendants Consolidated Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 72). No further briefing on this motion shall be permitted. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED: The Court clarifies its prior Order (Doc. 69) by specifying that local counsel need only attend the September 22, 2020 hearing personally if they intend to participate in oral argument. If local counsel does not intend to participate in oral argument, then they shall be permitted to attend remotely by following the instructions contained in this Courts prior Order. (Doc. 69 at 5.) re (70 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 36 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 18, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: (71 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Amicus Brief (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Celina Stewart, #2 Affidavit Nancy Leifer) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Klanke, Patricia)
September 17, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corey Stapleton. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (James, Austin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 43 Response to Motion re (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stephen Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affadavit of Audrey McCue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to McCue Affadavit, #3 Affidavit Affadavit Paula Jaconetty, #4 Affidavit Affidavit Kathleen Mumme, #5 Affidavit Affidavit Dr. Greg Holzman, #6 Affidavit Affidavit Justin Sakalis, #7 Affidavit Affadavit Raphael Graybill, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit Exhibit M, #21 Exhibit Exhibit N, #22 Exhibit Exhibit O, #23 Exhibit Exhibit P, #24 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #25 Exhibit Exhibit R) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael) Modified on 9/21/2020 to correct event text (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION File Overlength Brief Raphael Graybill appearing for Defendant Stephen Bullock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Graybill, Raphael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re (39 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC, 76 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Objection by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 39 Response to Motion re: (2 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (8 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha) Modified on 9/18/2020 to correct docket text as incorrect event was selected. (HEG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT in Support re (74 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 37 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Abha Khanna appearing for Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Clarify Doc. 69 Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motion for consolidation (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the Plaintiffs respective motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Docs. 2; 8) is CONSOLIDATED with a trial on the merits. The parties shall be prepared at the September 22, 2020 hearing to present their case for and against the issuance of the permanent injunctive relief sought by Plaintiffs in both the lead (CV 2066HDLC) and member (CV2067HDLC) cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that time for oral argument at the September 22, 2020 hearing (Doc. 35) shall be allocated as follows: (See order for complete details.) Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/16/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Coleson, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Stuedemann, Angela)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Bopp, James)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Milbank, Courtney)
September 15, 2020 Filing 30 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman, to PHV counsel Coleson regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Letter and order emailed to counsel. (HEG)
September 15, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Angela Stuedemann is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 15, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Richard Coleson is now a registered e-filer and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel, Angela Studemann regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of letter and order emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by DCCC, DSCC, Montana Democratic Party Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Khanna, Abha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED: The motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 51, 52, 53, 54) are GRANTED on the condition that they do their own work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Bopp, Ms. Stuedemann, Ms. Milbank, and Mr. Coleson file a separate pleading acknowledging their admission under the terms set forth above within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED: LWVMTs motion (Doc. 59) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, the LWVMT shall be permitted to participate in this case as amicus by filing an amicus brief on or before September 17, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any amicus brief filed by the LWVMT shall not exceed 4000 words. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 14, 2020 Remark: PHV counsel Dennis Polio and Jason Torchinsky are now registered e-filers and will receive electronic notifications in this matter. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 Brief/Memorandum in Support re (24 in 6:20-cv-00067-DLC) MOTION to Intervene filed by League of Women Voters of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Disclosure Statement) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene Michael Alan Kauffman appearing for Interested Party League of Women Voters of Montana Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Norris, Cameron)
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Weir, Bryan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Green, Tyler)
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Donald J. Trump for President, Montana Republican State Central Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee re (19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 19 in 6:20-cv-00066-DLC) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,, Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (McCarthy, Thomas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION Richard E. Coleson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540015.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION Courtney Turner Milbank to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540018.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION Angela Stuedemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772540001.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION James Bopp Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 09772539998.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Dennis Polio regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of order and letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman to PHV counsel Jason Torchinsky regarding the CM/ECF registration requirements. Copy of order and letter emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED: Intervenor-Plaintiffs motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 43, 44) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for admission pro hac vice (Docs. 7, 8, 9, 10) in the member case (6:20-cv-00067-DLC) are DENIED subject to renewal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/10/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Emily E. Jones Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Case Nos. 6:20-cv-00066-DLC and 6:20-cv-00067-DLC are CONSOLIDATED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). Pursuant to the Guide for Filing in the District of Montana regarding consolidated cases, all documents shall be e-filed in the lead case 6:20-cv-00066-DLC and spread to the appropriate member case 6:20-cv-00067-DLC. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS AND INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/9/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-00066-DLC, 6:20-cv-00067-DLC (HEG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION Courtney Turner Milbank to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540018.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Richard E. Coleson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540015.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Angela Stuedemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2540001.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit) (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION James Bopp Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2539998.) Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Jones, Emily) Modified on 9/16/2020 to correct motion termed date (HEG).
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Stephen Bullock, Corey Stapleton. Original Summons emailed to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Stapleton) (HEG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Jones, Emily) Modified on 9/10/2020 Term motion per Order #11 (HEG).
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner. (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emily E. Jones appearing for Plaintiffs Joe Lamm, Brent Nave, Fiona Nave, Jeff Wagner, Sylvia Wagner (Jones, Emily)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Joe Lamm, Jeff Wagner, Fiona Nave, Brent Nave, Sylvia Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
September 9, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2539817 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamm et al v. Bullock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Nave
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson
Represented By: Angela Stuedemann
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Lamm
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson
Represented By: Angela Stuedemann
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Wagner
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson
Represented By: Angela Stuedemann
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona Nave
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson
Represented By: Angela Stuedemann
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Wagner
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson
Represented By: Angela Stuedemann
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravalli County Republican Central Committee
Represented By: Emily E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Stapleton
Represented By: Austin M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bullock
Represented By: Raphael Graybill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?