Doverspike v. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Doverspike
Defendant: KJM Investments, John J. Murphy and Michael Anthony Allen
Case Number: 6:2021cv00029
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Transfer Amended Complaint filed by KJM Investments, John J. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. John J. Murphy) (Carpenter, Charles)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Transfer Amended Complaint re: #11 Charles Henry Carpenter appearing for Defendants KJM Investments, John J. Murphy (Carpenter, Charles) Modified on 5/18/2021 to create link to Amended Complaint (HEG).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The preliminary pretrial conference set for June 16, 2021 is VACATED, and shall be rescheduled for July 19, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The remaining dates in the preliminary pretrial conference order (Doc. 10) are rescheduled as follows: Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan, and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/12/2021. The hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss scheduled for June 21, 2021 is hereby VACATED, and shall be rescheduled for July 19, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/17/2021. (HEG)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer filed by Lisa Doverspike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Brian Shapiro as Receiver, #2 Exhibit B - Allen Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Allen Declaration 12-07-2020, #4 Exhibit D - Allen Declaration 12-21-2020, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of John J Murphy 01-13-2021, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Michael Allen 02-15-2021) (Lay, Kenneth)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Patrick Clark on behalf of Lisa Doverspike (Clark, Brett)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference and Related Dates and Motions Hearing Kenneth K. Lay appearing for Plaintiff Lisa Doverspike (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lay, Kenneth)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/4/2021. (SLL)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Doverspike. (Lay, Kenneth)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER:Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/9/2021. The parties shall appear before the undersigned on June 16, 2021 at 1:30 p.m., for the purposes of participating in a preliminary pretrial conference. See order for call-in information. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/27/2021. (HEG)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian M. Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/27/2021. (HEG)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/23/2021. Plaintiff shall file her response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before May 13, 2021. Signed Magistrate Judge John Johnston. April 23, 2021. (SLL)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Kenneth K. Lay appearing for Plaintiff Lisa Doverspike Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Lay, Kenneth)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Doverspike. (HEG)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing MT First Judicial District Court, L & C County Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (HEG)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer filed by KJM Investments, John J. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. John J. Murphy) (Carpenter, Charles)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Charles Henry Carpenter appearing for Defendants KJM Investments, John J. Murphy Motions referred to John Johnston. (Carpenter, Charles)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Mailing of Consent Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically provided to counsel Kenneth K. Lay, Charles Henry Carpenter. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/26/2021. (HEG)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from MT First Judicial District Court, L & C County, case number DDV-2021-242. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2645846 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doverspike v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KJM Investments
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Murphy
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Doverspike
Represented By: Kenneth K. Lay
Represented By: Brett Patrick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?