Lee v. State of Montana et al
Petitioner: Dominic Keith Lee
Respondent: State of Montana, Bob Olson and START Program
Case Number: 6:2021cv00074
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 Mail re #5 sent to Lee Returned as Undeliverable. Remailed to Lee at Connections Corrections Program (Butte), 111 West Broadway Street, Butte, MT 59701 address given on DOC website (TAG)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dominic Keith Lee. Judge Magistrate Judge John Johnston termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/12/2021. Mailed to Lee (TAG)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dominic Keith Lee. (TAG)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Petition due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/5/2021. Mailed to Lee with form (TAG)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Dominic Keith Lee. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Dominic Keith Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dominic Keith Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bob Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: START Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?