Grand River Enterprises Six Nations v. Knudsen
Plaintiff: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations
Defendant: Austin Knudsen
Case Number: 6:2023cv00048
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. GRE's Emergency #26 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal is DENIED. 2. GRE's #31 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 31, Doc. 32-1) is STAYED pending GRE's Motion for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/1/2023. (ACC)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2023 re #26 MOTION filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations, #31 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. Present in the courtroom for the plaintiff is Robert Lukes, Andrew Butler and Terisa Oomens for the defendant, and Kelli Keegan for the plaintiff appearing via ZOOM. Parties are advised of the purpose of todays hearing. Arguments are heard by Keegan, Lukes and Butler. This is matter is deemed submitted and an order will be issued forth with. Nothing further from the parties. Hearing commenced at 9:00 and concluded at 10:15. (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: A. Sterup), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines as to #28 Redaction request ddl 8/15/23. (ACC)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION for Emergency Injunction filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hekman, Michael)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION filed by Austin Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Oomens, Terisa)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #31 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #26 MOTION : Motion Hearing is set for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM at the Paul Hatfield Federal Courthouse, Helena, MT, before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/8/2023. (SLL)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines as to #25 Transcript ddl; filed 7/25/23. (ACC)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: On August 7, 2023, Defendant filed an #34 unopposed motion for extension of time to file their response brief to Plaintiff's #26 Motion for Emergency Injunction. Upon review of the unopposed motion and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' motion is GRANTED. The Defendant will have up to and including August 11, 2023, to file his response brief. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/7/2023. (ACC)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION . Terisa Marie Oomens appearing for Defendant Austin Knudsen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Oomens, Terisa)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations re #27 Emergency Filing, #26 MOTION of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion 22-15466) (Lukes, Robert)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #31 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration with Exhibits) (Lukes, Robert)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Robert C. Lukes appearing for Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Lukes, Robert)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Austin Knudsen. (Oomens, Terisa)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Austin Knudsen Court reporter Yvette Heinze... (Zackheim, Alan)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/14/2023 before Judge Morris. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the clerks office, or the court reporter. NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact court reporter Yvette Heinze, 406-422-8619, yvettecsrrpr@gmail.com. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website.. Redaction Request due 8/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2023. (YMH) Modified on 8/8/2023 to correct date of hearing (ACC).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Emergency Filing (Brief in Support of Motion #26 ) filed by Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Keegan, Kelli) Modified on 7/26/2023 to add docket text (MMS).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Emergency Filing (Motion for Injunction) filed by Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Keegan, Kelli) Modified on 7/25/2023 to turn event into a pending motion (MMS).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations for proceedings held on 7/14/2023 before Judge Brian Morris. Court reporter Yvette Heinze. Type of transcript: 14-Day.. Transcript due by 8/7/2023. (Lukes, Robert)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of USCA as to #22 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations (ACC)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 USCA Case Number 23-35494 for #22 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (ACC)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMTDC-3101592. (Lukes, Robert)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: GREs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #6 is DENIED, IN PART. The Court DENIES GREs request for a temporary restraining order.The Court reserves ruling on GREs request for a preliminary injunction and show-cause hearing pending resolution of the motions now before the Montana state district court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/17/2023. (MMS)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Austin Knudsen. (Oomens, Terisa)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #15 Emergency Filing Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Lukes, Robert)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2023 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. Present in the courtroom for Plaintiff is Robert Lukes and PHV counsel Kelli Keegan (via ZOOM). Andrew Butler, Terisa Oomens and Alan Zackheim present for Defendant. Parties are advised of the purpose of todays proceeding. Arguments are heard by Keegan and Butler. Matter is deemed submitted. Order will be issued as soon as possible. Hearing commenced at 11:03 and concluded at 12:14. (Court Reporter Yvette Heinze.) (Law Clerk: L. Love), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG) Modified on 7/14/2023 to correct name for counsel Butler. NEF regenerated (HEG).
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Daniel Zackheim on behalf of Austin Knudsen (Zackheim, Alan)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing on #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/13/2023. (MPB)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Emergency Filing filed by Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Lukes, Robert)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Keegan, Kelli)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines as to #13 Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Cnsl Keegan. (ACC)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelli Keegan. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/27/2023. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/12/2023. (KAH)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Kelli J. Keegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-3097613.). Robert C. Lukes appearing for Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Affidavit Certification Under MRPC 8.5, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Lukes, Robert)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Corporate Disclosure, Motion for TRO PI and order to show cause, Brief and exhibits 1-2, Declaration of Ferrigan and exhibits A-J, Declaration of Opp, and proposed Order. Served on Montana Attorney General on 7/11/2023, filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. Austin Knudsen answer due date 8/1/2023. (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Order re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction. (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Deanna Opp filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Donald Ferrigan filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show cause, and Preliminary Injunction. Robert C. Lukes appearing for Plaintiff Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Lukes, Robert). Added MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/10/2023 (ACC).
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Lukes, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is ASSIGNED to Chief United States District Judge Brian Morris for all further proceedings with no referral to a United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2023. (ACC)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/10/2023. (APP)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Austin Knudsen. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (HEG)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY,INJUNCTIVE, AND OTHER RELIEF against Austin Knudsen, filed by Grand River Enterprises Six Nations. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3095566 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations v. Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations
Represented By: Michael H. Hekman
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Kelli J. Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Knudsen
Represented By: Andrew Butler
Represented By: Terisa Marie Oomens
Represented By: Alan Daniel Zackheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?