Reed et al v. Montana Department of Revenue
Plaintiff: Tom Reed and Jerry Reed
Defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Case Number: 6:2023cv00051
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw and #26 First MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/18/2023. (APP)
September 15, 2023 Filing 26 First MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Brian J. Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Brian)
September 15, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Eleventh Amendment filed by Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Miller, Brian)
September 15, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Eleventh Amendment filed by Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Miller, Brian)
September 15, 2023 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw . Brian J. Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Brian)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Responses to motions to dismiss due by 9/15/2023. Reply in support of motion for preliminary injunction due by 9/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/6/2023. (TXB)
September 5, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Brian J. Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 20 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
August 25, 2023 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #18 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Eleventh Amendment filed by Montana Department of Revenue. (Cochenour, Matthew)
August 25, 2023 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Eleventh Amendment. Matthew T. Cochenour appearing for Defendant Montana Department of Revenue. (Cochenour, Matthew)
August 23, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Cochenour on behalf of All Defendants (Cochenour, Matthew)
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
August 22, 2023 Filing 15 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
August 22, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brynn Dennehy) (Cail, Hannah)
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/30/2023. (APP)
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #1 Complaint, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Ripeness MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint filed by Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hannah Cail, #2 Exhibit Management Agreement, #3 Exhibit Jan 10 Dept Ltr to Licensee, #4 Exhibit Jan 17 Resp Ltr from Licensee, #5 Exhibit Jan 26 Dept Ltr to Licensee, #6 Exhibit Feb 6 Resp Ltr from Licensee, #7 Exhibit Dept Notice of Proposed Dept Action, #8 Exhibit Dept ODR Hearing Schedule, #9 Exhibit Reed v MDOR State Ct Complaint, #10 Exhibit Reed v. MDOR Order to Show Cause) (Cail, Hannah)
August 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Ripeness, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint . Hannah Cail appearing for Defendant Montana Department of Revenue. (Cail, Hannah)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 8/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/9/2023. (TXB)
August 8, 2023 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Hannah Cail appearing for Defendant Montana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cail, Hannah)
July 28, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion, Brief. Served on Attorney General for State of Montana on 7/25/2023, filed by Tom Reed, Jerry Reed. (Miller, Brian)
July 28, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion, Brief. Served on Montana Department of Revenue on 7/25/2023, filed by Tom Reed, Jerry Reed. Montana Department of Revenue answer due date 8/15/2023. (Miller, Brian)
July 25, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Montana Department of Revenue. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (HEG)
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to brief) (Miller, Brian)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 WITHDRAWN - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Brian J. Miller appearing for Plaintiffs Jerry Reed, Tom Reed. (Miller, Brian) Modified on 9/18/2023 (APP).
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Montana Department of Revenue. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (APP)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Jerry Reed, Tom Reed, re #1 Complaint (Miller, Brian)
July 24, 2023 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Montana Department of Revenue, filed by Tom Reed, Jerry Reed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Hannah McGregor, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)
July 24, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3102760 (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Montana Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Reed
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Reed
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Courtney Cosgrove
Represented By: Hannah Cail
Represented By: Matthew T. Cochenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?