Trimp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ronald M. Trimp
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2023cv00079
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2005 Review of Agency Action-HHS
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 Social Security Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opening brief is due within 60 days of filing of the answer. Defendant's response brief due within 30 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, due within 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. Opening Brief due by 3/11/2024 (APP)
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 Administrative Record filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/15/2023. (APP)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Martin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martin, Justin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ronald M. Trimp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald M. Trimp
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Justin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?