Reed et al v. Ellison et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Reed, Charles Adam Fiechtner, Sr and John Reginald Reed
Defendant: John Ellison, Amelia Lyon, Mary Melton and Missoula Housing Authority
Case Number: 9:2011cv00102
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 11 Findings and Recommendations. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. However, this dismissal shall not operate as an adjudicati on on the merits of Reed's claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this matter. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/8/2011. (APP, ) Modified on 12/8/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Reed this date (APP, ).
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 7 Findings and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) as to Plaintiffs John Reginald Reed and Charles Adam Fiechtner, Sr. only. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/1/2011. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs this date. (NOS, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Patricia Ann Reed, directing Clerk of Court to file 2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner, filed by Charles Adam Fiechtner, Sr, John Reginald Reed, Patricia Ann Reed, and ORDER Setting: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2011.) Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/12/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 10/12/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Reed this date (APP, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Ellison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Adam Fiechtner, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reginald Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?