Peterson v. Frink et al

Petitioner: Ronald Peterson
Respondent: Martin Frink and Steve Bullock
Case Number: 9:2012cv00125
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LAKE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 66 , 67 in full; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Claim 1 of the Amended Petition 39 is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/29/2016. (TAG, )
January 26, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 66 in full. A certificate of appealability is DENIED as to Claims 2 and 3 of the Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/26/2016. (TAG, )
November 27, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM PETITIONER. Response due on or before December 11, 2012. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/27/2012. Mailed to Petersen. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Frink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Frink
Represented By: C. Mark Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Bullock
Represented By: C. Mark Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?