Federal Trade Commission v. Emerica Media Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Emerica Media Corporation, Global Voice Mail, Ltd., Network Assurance, Inc., Techmax Solutions, Inc., Voice Mail Professionals, Inc., Steven V. Sann, Terry D. Lane, Nathan M. Sann, Robert M. Braach, Bibliologic, Ltd., American eVoice, Ltd., FoneRight, Inc., HearYou2, Inc. and SecuratDat, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2013cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/17/2017. (NOS) (Modified to update docket text.) (NOS)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER as to Corporate Defendants. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/28/2017. (ASG)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting 282 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 7/21/2017, Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission shall filed either (1) proposed Stipulated Orders for Permanent Injunctions and Monetary Judgments for the Court's approval, or (2) a status report. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the summary judgment hearing set for 5/24/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/22/2017. (NOS)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 240 Motion for Sanctions and to Compel; denying 242 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 257 Motion to Compel. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial set forMarch 20, 2017, are VACATED and will be reset following the resolution of theFTC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/3/2017. Copy mailed to Sann. (ASG) (ASG).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT BRAACH. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/30/2017. Mailed to Sann. (TAG)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER. It is hereby ordered that Mr. Van de Wetering shall, on or before November 18, 2016, advise the Court whether he has been returned to active status. If not, Mr. Van de Wetering and Defendant Robert Braach shall arrange for the substitution of new counsel. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/1/2016. (NOS, )
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying 202 Motion for Order Authorizing Increase in Phone Minutes. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/26/2016. (TAG, )
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 126 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 133 Motion to release funds; denying 173 Motion for release of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/8/2015. (NOS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Emerica Media Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Kathryn C. Decker
Represented By: Richard McKewen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerica Media Corporation
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Voice Mail, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Assurance, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techmax Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voice Mail Professionals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven V. Sann
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry D. Lane
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan M. Sann
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Braach
Represented By: Joshua S. Van de Wetering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibliologic, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American eVoice, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FoneRight, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HearYou2, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SecuratDat, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Lustigman
Represented By: Sarah J. Rhoades
Represented By: Scott A. Shaffer
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?