Rukes v. State of Montana et al
Petitioner: Jack Norman Rukes
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana and Martin Frink
Case Number: 9:2013cv00116
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING RESPONDENTS' 41 MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/30/2014. (TAG, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING RELIEF UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 60(b). Paragraph 1 of the Order of May 23, 2014 ( 37 at 3), is VACATED. Rukes's petition for writ of habeas corpus is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. A certificate of appealability, to the extent it is requi red, is DENIED. The State's unopposed motion to renew its motion for stay and deem previous briefing re-submitted 56 is GRANTED. The Court will issue a ruling on that motion shortly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/29/2014. (TAG, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for an Extension of the Rule 62 Stay. The stay shall remain in effect until September 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/11/2014. (TAG, )
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 41 motion for stay pending appeal, recharacterized as a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62 to suspend the injunction issued on May 23, 2014. Paragraph 1 of the Order of May 23, 2014 37 is SUSPENDED for a period of 30 days. For the period of the suspension, the State is not required by this Court to renew or to continue with renewed proceedings in the trial court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/9/2014. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rukes v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana
Represented By: Katie F. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Frink
Represented By: Katie F. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack Norman Rukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?