Chaney v. Wadsworth et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Chaney
Defendant: Daniel Wadsworth, Trevor Wadsworth, Kim Aipperspach, City of Ronan, City of Ronan Police Department and Does 1-10
Case Number: 9:2014cv00177
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: LAKE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER ADOPTING 162 Findings and Recommendations IN FULL; granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Summary Judgment, 99 Motion for Summary Judgment, 102 Motion for Summary Judgment, 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. They are Gra nted as to the balance of Chaney's claims that remain in this action, and those claims are DISMISSED. They are DENIED as MOOT as to those claims over which this Court has already declined to exercise supplemental jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that all outstanding motions are DENIED as MOOT and all deadlines VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial set for October 26, 2015, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/13/2015. (NOS, )
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/15/2015. (TCL, )
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 55 Motion to deny class certification with respect to Chaney's federal claims; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 89 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/1/2015. (dle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney v. Wadsworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chaney
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Ann Sherwood
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Aipperspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ronan Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen O'Rourke-Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?