Chaney v. Wadsworth et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Chaney |
Defendant: |
Daniel Wadsworth, Trevor Wadsworth, Kim Aipperspach, City of Ronan, City of Ronan Police Department and Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
9:2014cv00177 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Missoula Office |
County: |
LAKE |
Presiding Judge: |
Dana L. Christensen |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
188
ORDER ADOPTING 162 Findings and Recommendations IN FULL; granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Summary Judgment, 99 Motion for Summary Judgment, 102 Motion for Summary Judgment, 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. They are Gra nted as to the balance of Chaney's claims that remain in this action, and those claims are DISMISSED. They are DENIED as MOOT as to those claims over which this Court has already declined to exercise supplemental jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that all outstanding motions are DENIED as MOOT and all deadlines VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial set for October 26, 2015, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/13/2015. (NOS, )
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/15/2015. (TCL, )
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
127
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 55 Motion to deny class certification with respect to Chaney's federal claims; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 89 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/1/2015. (dle)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?