Moore v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Dale D. Moore |
Defendant: |
The Travelers Indemnity Company and Allstate Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
9:2015cv00071 |
Filed: |
June 18, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Missoula Office |
County: |
MISSOULA |
Presiding Judge: |
Dana L. Christensen |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeremiah C. Lynch |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 3, 2017 |
Filing
153
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 152 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/3/2017. (dle)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing
141
ORDER re ADOPTING IN FULL 97 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Dale D. Moore, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Ins, 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Dale D. Moore, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Fire and Casua lty Insurance Company, 44 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Dale D. Moore, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss Certain Defenses filed by Dale D. Moor e, 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Loss of Consortium Claim filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. The Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial are VACATED and RESET as follows: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2016. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/2/2016 at 2:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial RESET for 11/14/2016 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/5/2016. (DLE)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing
115
ORDER denying as moot 86 Motion to Compel; granting 107 Motion to Compel Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/28/2016. (TXB, )
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
97
ORDER grantin 53 MOTION to Withdraw Admission Pursuant to Rule 36 filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Motions terminated: 53 MOTION to Withdraw Admission Pursuant to Rule 36 filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company., FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Dale D. Moore, 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment file d by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, 44 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Dale D. Moore, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss Certain Defenses filed by Dale D. Moore, 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Loss of Consortium Claim filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/15/2016. (TCL, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?