Koontz v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Johna Koontz
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2015cv00108
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/28/2016. (APP, )
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/12/2016. (ASG, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 13 Stipulated Motion; granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/12/2015. (APP, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koontz v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johna Koontz
Represented By: Jessie Lea Lundberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Hansberry
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?