Danaher v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Susan Danaher
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance Company and Kemper Preferred
Case Number: 9:2015cv00114
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that attorney Samantha Travis, of Ogle, Worm & Travis, PLLP is granted withdrawal as attorney of record for Plaintiff Susan Danaher. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2017. Associated Cases: 9:15-cv-00114-DLC, 9:16-cv-00088-DLC (ASG)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re (65 in 9:15-cv-00114-DLC, 30 in 9:16-cv-00088-DLC) Stipulation filed by Susan Danaher. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/16/2017. Associated Cases: 9:15-cv-00114-DLC, 9:16-cv-00088-DLC (NOS)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases CV-15-114-DLC and CV-16-88-DLC filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Motions due by 7/5/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 2:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 at 9:00 AM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. The Court's Order in CV 16-88-M-DLC dated October 11, 2016,(Doc. 11) shall remain in full force and effect in all other respects. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/22/2017. (NOS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danaher v. Trinity Universal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Danaher
Represented By: Amy Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall J. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Preferred
Represented By: Randall J. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?