Frost v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Michael A. Frost
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 9:2015cv00124
Filed: September 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Gilliam Dale for Defendant. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/10/2019. (ASG)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying 138 Motion for New Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay on enforcement of judgment, Doc. 147 , is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/23/2017. (NOS)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER. The Jury having returned a verdict, IT IS ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/15/2016. (NOS)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 110 Trial Brief filed by BNSF Railway Company. Evidence concerning the Incentive Compensation Plan, Personal Performance Index, and OSHA Accord is excluded from trial. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/14/2016. (dle)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER regarding in camera document as to Mr. Gavalla: It will not be produced to counsel as it does not appear to go to bias. A copy of the document will be filed under seal. An ORDER IN LIMINE is GRANTED that this matter will not be inquired into by either party. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/12/2016. (NOS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2016: # 1 SEALED attachment) (NOS).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Bifurcate; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine; denying 42 Motion to Strike ; denying 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Protective Order; denying 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/31/2016. (DLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Frost
Represented By: David R. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Jaclyn S. Laferriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?