Dutton v. Ascend Learning Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Dutton
Defendant: Ascend Learning Holdings, LLC, Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC and John Does A-E
Case Number: 9:2015cv00147
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in part Findings and Recommendations re 61 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/13/2017. (dle)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 50 Motion in Limine Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/30/2017. (TCL)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion in Limine Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/26/2017. (TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutton v. Ascend Learning Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Dutton
Represented By: Sydney E. McKenna
Represented By: Justin Starin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Learning Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?