Tempel v. ACE American Insurance Co., et al
Plaintiff: Christina Tempel
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Co., and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 9:2016cv00011
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. All deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/13/2017. (NOS)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 62 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/15/2017. (ASG)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying as moot 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 53 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant ESIS, Inc., the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/2/2017. (ASG)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff Tempel's claims against Defendant Mary Kay Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice.Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/6/2016. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tempel v. ACE American Insurance Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Tempel
Represented By: Lon J. Dale
Represented By: Dylan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Co.,
Represented By: Allan H. Baris
Represented By: Elizabeth Worth Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?