Blackwell et al v. LaFriniere
Plaintiff: Lawrence Blackwell and Randyl Blackwell
Defendant: Susan LaFriniere
Case Number: 9:2016cv00022
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/2/2017. (NOS)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Scheduling Order filed by Randyl H. Blackwell. Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2017. Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Scheduling Order filed by Randyl H. Blackwell. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/30/2017. (dle)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/24/2016. (ASG, )
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/10/2016. (DLE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell et al v. LaFriniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Blackwell
Represented By: Timothy C. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randyl Blackwell
Represented By: Timothy C. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan LaFriniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?